McKenna v. McDaniel et al
Petitioner: |
Patrick Charles McKenna |
Respondent: |
Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto and E.K. McDaniel |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00191 |
Filed: |
February 3, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Nature of Suit: |
Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 4, 2021 |
Filing
86
ORDER Granting 85 Motion for Dismissal of Action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
December 5, 2019 |
Filing
80
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 79 Petitioner's Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing
71
ORDER that 66 Petitioner's Motion to Temporarily Lift Stay to Amend is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the stay of this action shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 17, 2014 |
Filing
54
ORDER that 51 Motion to Temporarily Lift Stay to Amend is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is granted leave of court to amend his habeas corpus petition in this action to add the claims set forth in Exhibit A to the Motion to Temporarily Lift Stay 51 . FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the stay of this action imposed on May 9, 2012, is reinstated and shall remain in effect as described in 37 the Order entered May 9, 2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 12, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER Granting 38 Ex Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel. FPD for the District of Nevada is discharged from representation. FPD for the District of Arizona is appointed to represent the Petitioner. FPD for the District of Arizona shall file a notice of appearance within 30 days. Requirements of Local Rule IA 10-2 shall be waived. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 07/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 9, 2012 |
Filing
37
ORDER Denying as Moot 28 Motion to Dismiss, Granting 33 Motion to Substitute Party, and Granting 34 Motion to Stay. Status Report due by 6/15/2012. Renee Baker added in place of E.K. McDaniel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing
13
SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to 6/13/11 Status Conference. Amended Petition due by 9/12/2011. Respondents shall have 60 days to respond. Petitioner shall have 45 days to reply. Respondents shall have 30 days to respond to reply. If respondents file a m otion to dismiss, petitioner shall have 30 days to respond and respondents shall thereafter have 30 days to reply. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
March 8, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER that a telephonic Status Conference is set for 6/13/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing
6
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Granting 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and Granting 5 Motion for Stay of Execution. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2011. Notice of Represe ntation or Inability to Represent due by 3/11/2011. Copy of Order and 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus mailed to Respondents via Certified Mail. Tracking Number: 7009 0960 0000 4100 8273. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Michael Pescetta - ASB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?