Federal Trade Commission v. Ivy Capital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: 3 Day MBA, LLC, Business Development Division, LLC, Cherrytree Holdings, LLC, Corporate Credit Division, LLC, Credit Repair Division, LLC, Curva, LLC, Dream Financial, Enrich Wealth Group, LLC, Fortune Learning System, LLC, Fortune Learning, LLC, Global Finance Group, LLC, James G. Hanchett, John H. Harrison, Melyna Harrison, Benjamin E. Hoskins, Leanne Hoskins, ICI Development, Inc., Ivy Capital, Inc., Ivy Capital, LLC, Kierston Kirschbaum, Kyle G. Kirschbaum, Logic Solutions, LLC, Steven E. Lyman, Tracy Lyman, Mowab, Inc., Nevada Corporate Division, Inc., Oxford Debt Holdings, LLC, Oxford Financial, LLC, Revsynergy, LLC, S&T Time, LLC, Sell It Vizions, LLC, Steven J. Sonnenberg, Tax Planning Division, LLC, The Shipper, LLC, Vianet, Inc., Virtual Profit, LLC, Virtucon, LLC, Joshua F. Wickman, Christopher M. Zelig and Zyzac Commerce Solutions, Inc.
Receiver: Robb Evans
Unknown: Chad R. Fears
Case Number: 2:2011cv00283
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting 455 Stipulation Re: 454 Response to 449 Motion. Replies due by 6/25/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER Granting 451 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 449 Motion (First Request). Responses due by 6/15/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Final Monetary Judgment against Relief Defendant Leanne Hoskins is hereby amended and a monetary Judgment for $1,550,848.48 is entered in favor of the Federal Trade Commission and against relief defendant Leanne Hoskins. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER Denying 427 Motion for release of funds. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 421 Defendants' Motion Allow Sale of Property Subject to Asset Freeze. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting 417 Motion for for Order (1) Approving Final Report and Accounting; (2) Approving Settlement; (3) Allowing Claims and Approving Plan for Distribution of Receivership Assets; (4) Approving Receiver's and Counsels' Fees and Expenses From September 1, 2012 Through Closing; (5) Discharging Receiver; (6) Relieving Receiver of All Duties and Liabilities; (7) Exonerating Receiver's Bond; (8) Authorizing Abandonment and Destruction of Records and Relating Relief; and (9) Granting Relief Pertaining to Notice to Creditors. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER Granting 414 Unopposed Motion to Release Federal 529 College Accounts. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 409 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Federal Trade Commission against Benjamin E. Hoskins and Dream Financial, jointly and severally with all other defendants in this case that have already settled with the FTC, in the amount of $130,375,057.52 plus prej udgment interest in the amount of $3,589,426.92; against Oxford Financial, LLC in the amount of $1,529,292.25 plus prejudgment interest in the amount of $9,254.48; and against Leanne Hoskins in the amount of $1,128,795.78 plus pre judgment interest in the amount of $6,830.89; and against Mowab, Inc. in the amount of $203,118.40 plus prejudgment interest in the amount of $1,229.17. PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 407 FINAL JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Federal Trade Commission against Business Development Division, LLC, Corporate Credit Division, LLC, Credit Repair Division, LLC, Nevada Corporate Division, Inc., Tax Planning Division, LLC. in the amount of $130,375,057.52 plus prejudgment interest in the amount of $3,589,426.92, as equitable monetary relief for consumer injury. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER that 312 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 320 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 323 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission shall submit a prposed order consistent with this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER Granting 389 Motion to Extend the Date for Final Report and Accounting. FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver shall have sixty days to file its final report and accounting following the entry of judgment or other disposition of the claims in the pending summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER for MONETARY RELIEF in favor of Federal Trade Commission against Tracy Lyman, S&T Time, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER Granting 338 Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professionals' Fees and Expenses From April 1, 2011 Through August 31, 2012; and (2) Granting Relief From Local Rule 66-5 Pertaining to Notice to Creditors. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER Granting 346 Unopposed Motion to Lift the Injunction and Asset Freeze to Allow Them to Replace Their Cars. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/10/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER Granting 345 Motion to Extend Partial Stay of Proceedings as to Certain Parties Pending Completion of Proposed Settlements. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER Denying 321 Motion to Strike 319 Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER Granting 328 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and Denying 327 FTC's Motion to Extend Time as Moot. The Clerk of Court is ordered to reinstate 323 FTC's MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 09/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER Denying 322 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. FURTHER ORDERED that 323 Motion for Summary Judgment is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER Granting 313 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 312 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/12/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER Granting 315 Motion for Partial Stay of Proceedings as to Certain Parties Pending Completion of Proposed Settlements. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 271 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Document Requests. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until 6/22/12 in which to take the deposition of the FTC's expert witness. The remain ing pre-trial deadlines are extended as follows: (1) the last day to file dispositive motions is July 23, 2012; (2) the joint pretrial order is due on or before August 23, 2012 unless dispositive motions are filed, in which case the joint pretrial order shall be filed within 30 days after the Court's decision on the last dispositive motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/22/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 5/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER Granting 263 Notice of Change of Attorney. Fillmore Spencer, LLC is substituted in place and stead of Hutchison & Steffen, LLC for defendants Fortune Learning, LLC; The Shipper, LLC; James G. Hanchett; and Steven J. Sonnenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Granting 253 Motion for Leave to Appear by Government Attorney for Attorney Ross Feldmann for Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 1/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Granting 244 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney Svetlana Gans. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/10/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER that the receivers recommendations as set forth in 231 are approved in their entirety, as follows in the attached order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/2/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Granting 239 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney for Attorney Daniel O. Hanks for Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER that the receiver release $5,950 to the Hoskins for payment of their childs medical related expenses. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Granting 218 Motion for Order Authorizing Receiver to Abandon Certain Personal Property from the Estate and Granting Relief from Local Rule 66-5 Pertaining to Notice to Creditors. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER Granting 202 Motion for Attorney Fees for Order (1) Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professionals' Fees and Expenses From Inception of Receivership Through March 31, 2011; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Liquidate UBS Stock Account; and (3) Granting Relief From Local Rule 66-5 Pertaining to Notice to Creditors. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER that the receivers recommendation 196 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED with regard to the Hoskins and GRANTED with regard to Wickman;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receivers recommendation 200 regarding legal budgets be, and the same hereby is, AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER that the stay on the commencement of deposition discovery inthis action is hereby vacated.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may take up to 30 depositions and the Defendants,collectively, may also take up to 30 depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 170 Motion to Strike. Denying 171 Motion for an order granting receiver's recommendation. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Denying 37 and 38 Defendants Enrich Wealth Group, LLC's and Joshua Wickman's Motion to Dismiss; Denying 83 and 84 Defendants Benjamin Hoskins', and Oxford Financial, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and; Denying 86 Defendants' Ivy Capital's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Regarding Release of Frozen Funds for Living Expenses. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 168 Order affirming 163 Receivers Recommendations in its entirety is hereby AMENDED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER that Mr. Zelzig shall register with CM/ECF and a "Notice of Compliance with Special Order 109" Shall be completed and Filed no later than 5/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Denying 39 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Affirming 163 Receiver's Recommendation regarding living expenses and related matters for the defendants in this case. Receiver shall dispense the fees as noted in the report. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/21/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DENYING as moot 27 Motion for Modification of the temporary restraining order; DENYING as moot 30 Motion for Order to Show Cause; DENYING as moot 33 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/25/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 62 Ex Parte Motion Sealing Exhibit C to the Shipper Defendant's Opposition to Federal Trade Commission's Request for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 36 Notice of Change of Attorney filed by Attorney Aviva Y. Gordon as to Leanne Hoskins, Benjamin E. Hoskins and, Oxford Financial, LLC. Att, Attorney Chad R. Fears terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney for Attorney Dotan Weinman for Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation and Order to Extend TRO, Adjourn Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and set Rule 26(f) Conference. 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Deadlines: Responses due by 3/15/2011. Replies due by 3/21/2011. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2011 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Ivy Capital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Day MBA, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Development Division, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherrytree Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Credit Division, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Repair Division, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curva, LLC
Represented By: Steven R Bartell
Represented By: Tracy Green
Represented By: Ann C. Schneider
Represented By: Steven L Zelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Financial
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrich Wealth Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Crockett
Represented By: James L Edwards
Represented By: Blair Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortune Learning System, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortune Learning, LLC
Represented By: Joseph S. Kistler
Represented By: Diane L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Finance Group, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Hanchett
Represented By: Joseph S. Kistler
Represented By: Diane L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Harrison
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melyna Harrison
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin E. Hoskins
Represented By: Aviva Y Gordon
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Hoskins
Represented By: Aviva Y Gordon
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICI Development, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: David R Koch
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Capital, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kierston Kirschbaum
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle G. Kirschbaum
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logic Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Lyman
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Lyman
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowab, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Corporate Division, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Debt Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Financial, LLC
Represented By: Aviva Y Gordon
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revsynergy, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&T Time, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sell It Vizions, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Sonnenberg
Represented By: Joseph S. Kistler
Represented By: Diane L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Planning Division, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shipper, LLC
Represented By: Joseph S. Kistler
Represented By: Diane L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vianet, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtual Profit, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtucon, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua F. Wickman
Represented By: Robert D. Crockett
Represented By: James L Edwards
Represented By: Blair Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Zelig
Represented By: Steven R Bartell
Represented By: Tracy Green
Represented By: Ann C. Schneider
Represented By: Steven Zelzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zyzac Commerce Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R Bartell
Represented By: Tracy Green
Represented By: Ann C. Schneider
Represented By: Steven Zelzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Robb Evans
Represented By: Gary Owen Caris
Represented By: Lesley Anne Hawes
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Emily C Burton
Represented By: Shameka L Gainey
Represented By: Robert G. Schoshinski
Represented By: Dotan Weinman
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Chad R. Fears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?