JL Beverage Company, LLC v. Fortune Brands Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JL Beverage Company, LLC
Defendant: Fortune Brands Inc. and Jim Beam Brands Co.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00417
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 BENCH ORDER (Redacted). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 BENCH ORDER that judgment is granted in favor of Jim Beam on JLBeverages claims for relief; that judgment is granted in favor of JL Beverage on Jim Beam's first, second, and third counterclaims for relief; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER that Jim Beam's motion in limine #1 (ECF Nos. 208 and 209 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting ECF No. 232 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ryan R. Gile withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDERED that Defendants' motions to seal (ECF Nos. 210 and 226 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting ECF No. 224 Motion to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. 220 Response re ECF No. 209 Motion in Limine due by 2/24/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER - Jim Beam's Motion to Strike Jury Demand (ECF No. 193 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER - Jim Beam's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Unavailability of Damages (ECF No. 170 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The Motion is granted with respect to JL's damages claims based on royalties and actual damages. It is denied with respect to JL's damages claims based on disgorgement of Jim Beam's profits. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Denying 130 Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Costs. Granting 132 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 109 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to issue judgment in the form attached as Exhibit A to the Motion. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER that 111 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 113 Motion to Stay Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims without prejudice and for Entry of Final Judgment is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/14/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Denying 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims; Granting 77 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting 78 and 88 Defendants' Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 03/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Denying 36 JL Beverage's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JL Beverage Company, LLC v. Fortune Brands Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortune Brands Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Beam Brands Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL Beverage Company, LLC
Represented By: Ryan R Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?