May 29, 2016 |
Filing
116
ORDER Granting 115 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
February 10, 2016 |
Filing
104
ORDER Granting 103 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, effective 3/9/16. Mr. Owens shall have until March 9, 2016 to retain counsel who shall make an appearance in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice, or file a statement that he will be a ppearing pro se, that is, representing himself. The Attorney General shall serve Mr. Owen with a copy of this order at his last known address and file proof of service with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
September 18, 2015 |
Filing
98
ORDER that 81 Amended Complaint shall PROCEED as alleged. Answer to the Third Amended Complaint within 21 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 93 Notice re 4m Dismissal is VACATED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
86
ORDER Denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify for Appeal of Orders. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
October 23, 2013 |
Filing
83
ORDER Denying 82 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 23, 2013 |
Filing
80
ORDER Denying 64 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss and Denying 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Joinder of Claims. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Third Amended Complaint due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER Granting 72 Motion to Remove Former Counsel Robert J. Simon from CM/ECF Notifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 15, 2012 |
Filing
63
ORDER Granting 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification. The Clerk shall file Plaintiffs Supplemental Complaint 50 as her Second Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall provide Plaintiff the proper complaint and in form a pauperis forms to enable her to file a separate action.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 17, 2012 |
Filing
58
ORDER Denying 29 Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Decision to Strike. Granting 33 Motion to Extend Time Regarding Discovery/Nondispositive Matter. Denying 42 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Unauthorized Sur-Reply to Motion for Summary Judgmen t. Granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying as moot 39 Motion to Amend Civil Complaint 42 U.S.C. § 1983 to Add Defendants and Claims. Granting in part and Denying in part 50 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Denying 48 Motion for TRO. Denying 49 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
April 16, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER Denying 40 Motion to Add Power of Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER Granting 22 Defendants' Motion to Strike 12 Plaintiff's Amended Memorandum, 18 Notice of Motion, and 19 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDERED the Clerk shall electronically serve defendants a copy of this order and the amended complaint 11 . The Attorney General shall advise the court within 21 days from the date this order is entered whether service of process for the named defe ndants is accepted. If the Attorney General accepts service for any of the defendants, such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer/response within 60 days of the date of the notice of acceptance of service. Service must be accomplished within 120 days from the date that this order is entered. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|