Liguori et al v. Hansen et al
Plaintiff: Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc. and Steve Liguori
Defendant: Bert Hansen and Kawana Pohe
Case Number: 2:2011cv00492
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 532 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc., Lenard E. Schwartzer against Bert Hansen. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER The Court will therefore proceed to resolve the dispute related to attorney's fees in accordance with the Ninth Circuit's Mandate. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER granting 516 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Defendant is further ordered to make the payment to Plaintiffs by May 28, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall change the caption in this case name to the Plaintiff as "Lenard E. Schwartzer, Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee," in the place of Victoria Nelson, Chapter 7 Trustee in Bankruptcy. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER Unsealing 424 Response to Motion, 438 Transcript Designation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall make the necessary redactions to ECF Nos 435, 452, 453, 458, 465, 466, 467, 468 and 469 and file those documents on the public record by November 7, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER Unsealing 439 Response - Other, 454 Stipulation. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall make the necessary redactions to ECF Nos 420, 430, 448, 456 and 470 and file those documents on the public record by October 30, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER granting 460 Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER Granting 454 Stipulation to Extend Time re 448 SEALED MOTION to Appoint Receiver . ( Replies due by 8/17/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting 435 Motion to Strike and to Quash Writ of Execution. The hearing set in this matter for 6/5/2017 is Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER that 430 Supplemental Application for Judgment Debtor Exam is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting 421 Motion for Clarification. The Clerk of the Court shall change the caption in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting 416 Motion to Substitute Party. Victoria L. Nelson substituted for Steve Liguori. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USBC - JM)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER Granting 397 Motion to Continue Magistrate Judge Hearing. Motions Hearing 392 and 393 reset for 9/30/2016 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 391 JUDGMENT in favor of Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc., Steve Liguori against Bert Hansen. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER re 380 Post Trial Brief. The Court will award interest on the judgment for breach of contract from September 30, 2012 at the rate of 1 1/2 percent per month, or 18 percent per annum, simple interest through the date of judgment. The Court will also award prejudgment interest on the judgment for copyright infringement at the federal statutory rate. The Court will not offset the amount of Defendant's stipulated judgment on its counterclaim prior to calculating prejudgment interest on the judgment in Plaintiffs' favor. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 301 Motion for Reconsideration to Continue Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 03/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 294 Motion to Continue Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 03/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' 280 Motion for Leave to Amend Pleadings. Proposed Second Amended Complaint deadline: 3/3/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 02/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER that Defendants' 279 Response be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER Granting 277 Motion for Leave to File. Supplemental Brief due by 11/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER denying 247 Second Emergency Motion to Compel and 253 Second Emergency Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER Granting 256 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearin re 247 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing reset for 10/6/2015 at 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 242 Stipulation filed by Bert Hansen. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 230 Motion to Compel and 234 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Granting 216 Stipulation for Continuance. Judgment Debtor Exam reset for 7/29/2015 at 10:00 AM at the law offices of Hutchison & Steffen. Motion Hearing re 212 Motion for Judgment reset for 7/29/2015 at 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Granting 210 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 201 Motion for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Costs. Responses due by 6/26/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc., Steve Liguori against Bert Hansen. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Steven Liguouri and Bruno Liguouri Turquoise Trading Post, Inc., shall recover from Defendants Bert Hansen, indivi dually and doing business as Hoover Dam Snacketeria and the High Scaler Cafe, the amount of $1,181,000.00, with prejudgment interest of $814,890.00 and postjudgment interest at the federal statutory rate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pl aintiffs Steven Liguouri and Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading Post, Inc., shall recover from Defendants Bert Hansen, individually and doing business as Hoover Dam Snacketeria and the High Scaler Cafe, the amount of $150,000.00, with prejudgment interest of $2,573.01 and postjudgment interest at the federal statutory rate, along with costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Steven Liguouri and Bruno Liguouri Turquoise TradingPost, Inc., shall recover from Defendants Bert Hansen, individually and doing business as Hoover Dam Snacketeria and the High Scaler Caf, the amount of  6;1,200,000.00, with prejudgment interest of $828,000.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Steven Liguouri and Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading Post, Inc., shall recover from Defendants Bert Hansen, individually and doingbusiness as H oover Dam Snacketeria and the High Scaler Caf, the amount of $150,000.00, with prejudgment interest of $2,573.01 and postjudgment interest at the federal statutory rate, along with costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER: The Plaintiffs are hereby instructed to prepare and submit a proposed Judgement to the Court. The Plaintiffs are further instructed to serve the proposed Judgment on the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting 164 Stipulation Regarding Physical Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 98 Motion to Extend Time re: 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 100 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER requiring parties to submit a Joint Status Report 10/19/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Withdraw Admissions Pursuant to FRCP 36(b). The deemed admissions are withdrawn and the responses served on October 31, 2011, are deemed effective as of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying 8 Defendant Pohe's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 23 Defendant Bert Hansen's Countermotion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 24 Defendant Bert Hansen's Countermotion Disqualify is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Extend T ime and Alter Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as stated in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 25 Defendant Bert Hansen's Countermotion to Compel is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant shall have until 3 /21/12, to file an affidavit of fees and costs outlining the reasonable expenses, including attorney fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than as outlined herein, each party shall bear its own costs associated with the foregoing motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liguori et al v. Hansen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Liguori
Represented By: Ryan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kawana Pohe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?