Caesars World, Inc. v. July et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Caesars World, Inc.
Defendant: Marcel July and Octavius Tower LLC , NV
Case Number: 2:2011cv00536
Filed: April 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2012 Filing 85 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (AC)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 82 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Each party shall bear its own cost and attorney's fees incurred herein. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 06/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 2, 2012 Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 7/2/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Smith. Pursuant to the submission of the RE: 82 Stipulation of Dismissal, the Telephonic Status Hearing set before the Honorable C.W. Hoffman, Jr., on July 6, 2012, at 9:30 AM is vacated. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
June 28, 2012 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc. (Boyle, James)
May 30, 2012 Filing 81 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/30/2012 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: David Stewart; Def Counsel: Michael Sanft; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:26-2:29; Time of Hearing: 2:26-2:29 PM; Courtroom: 3C; Also present telephonically is Mr. July. The Case has settled and the documents are being finalized. The parties jointly request a 30 day extension of the case stay, it is so ordered. Further Telephonic Status Conference is set for July 6, 2012, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. The hearing will be vacated if dismissal paperwork is submitted prior to the hearing date.The parties are instructed to call telephone number: (702) 868-4921, access code: 123456, 5 minutes prior to the hearing time. The Court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
May 25, 2012 Filing 80 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/25/2012 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: David Stewart; Def Counsel: Michael Sanft; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:28-9:40; Time of Hearing: 9:28 AM; Courtroom: 3C; Mr. July is also present telephonically. The Court and the parties confer regarding the status of case settlement. Settlement has not been perfected, but the parties will continue to work towards case settlement. The Court sets further Telephonic Status Conference regarding Case Settlement for May 30, 2012, at 2:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman.The parties are instructed to call telephone number: (702) 868-4921, access code: 123456, 5 minutes prior to the hearing time. The Court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 78 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings to Finalize Settlement Documentation. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/25/2012 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/25/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 24, 2012 Filing 78 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Settlement Documentation and Notice of Settlement In Principal by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
April 9, 2012 Filing 77 NOTICE by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc. of Change of Firm Name (Boyle, James)
April 7, 2012 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Marcel July by Defendant Marcel July. (Sanft, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 75 Caesars World, Inc.'s ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Marcel July filed by Caesars World, Inc..(Sand, Nadya)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to 15 Counterclaim. Caesars World, Inc. answer due 4/9/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 3, 2012 Filing 73 NON-OPPOSITION to 64 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) Caesars World, Inc.'s Rule 6(b) Motion for Enlargment of Time to File Its Answer to Defendant Marcel July's Remaining Counterclaim MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) Caesars World, Inc.'s Rule 6(b) Motion for Enlargment of Time to File Its Answer to Defendant Marcel July's Remaining Counterclaim ; filed by Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER Grantung 70 Fourth MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/15/2012. Motions due by 7/16/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 26, 2012 Filing 72 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/26/2012 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Crtrm Administrator: Alana Kamaka; Pla Counsel: James Boyle; Def Counsel: John Parris for Michael Sanft; Court Reporter/FTR #: 11:08:23 - 11:37:11; Time of Hearing: 11:08:23 - 11:37:11; Courtroom: 3C; Mr. Sanft was unable to appear for this hearing as he was in a jury trial. Court takes under advisement 61 Motion to Compel. The Motion before the Court poses a question as to where the deposition of Mr. July will be taken. Representations of counsel were heard. Mr. Boyle's position is that he would be willing to have the deposition in Atlanta where lead counsel is, but doesn't feel he should bear any expense in that regard. He is opposed to having the deposition by video conference in German. In the alternative, if the Court is so inclined to order the video deposition, Mr. Boyle asked that the Court take into consideration the following concerns: 1. Finding a Court Reporter; 2. That Mr. July's attorney in Germany not be permitted to be present in the same room for that deposition; 3. Would like some assurance that Mr. July would not object to the taking of the deposition under the Hague Convention or some other legal authority that would preclude the plaintiff from usage fraud; 4. Would like the deposition to occur at the location of the Court Reporter; 5. Would like some assurance that Mr. July would be competent to testify while on medication. Mr. Boyle requested sanctions for Mr. July's failure to appear at the deposition. A request was made by Mr. Boyle to extend the discovery deadline another 60 days beyond the current deadline of 4/16/12. Mr. Parris clarified for the record that the letter proffered in the defendant's answer is dated 3/1/12. He had no objection to the five points stated by Mr. Boyle as well as the extension of the discovery deadline. He asked that the Court allow the video deposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AKK)
March 26, 2012 Filing 70 Fourth MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (Fourth Request) Special Scheduling Review Requested by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/26/2012. (Boyle, James)
March 23, 2012 Filing 69 RESPONSE to 66 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. Replies due by 4/2/2012. (Boyle, James)
March 23, 2012 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to 61 Emergency MOTION to Compel Deposition of July and For Sanctions ; filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. and for Sanctions (Boyle, James)
March 20, 2012 Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 3/20/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Smith. RE: 61 Emergency MOTION to Compel Deposition of July and For Sanctions - A Motion Hearing is set for March 26, 2012, at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
March 20, 2012 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 65 Response to Motion. ERROR: Document should've been filed as two separate entries by attorney Michael W. Sanft in accordance with Special Order 109. CORRECTION: Entry refiled by Court as 66 Motion for Protective Order. (no image attached)(MJZ)
March 16, 2012 Filing 66 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Marcel July. Motion ripe 3/16/2012. (MJZ)
March 16, 2012 Filing 65 RESPONSE to 61 Emergency MOTION to Compel Deposition of July and For Sanctions, filed by Defendant Marcel July. Replies due by 3/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sanft, Michael)
March 14, 2012 Filing 64 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) Caesars World, Inc.'s Rule 6(b) Motion for Enlargment of Time to File Its Answer to Defendant Marcel July's Remaining Counterclaim by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/14/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D)(Boyle, James)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Notice of Disassociation of Attorney Nicholas J. Santoro as to Caesars World, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 1, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc. of Disassociation of Attorney Nicholas J. Santoro, Esq. (Boyle, James)
February 28, 2012 Filing 61 Emergency MOTION to Compel Deposition of July and For Sanctions by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. Responses due by 3/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stewart Declaration and Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibit Sand Declaration and Exhibits 1-3, # 3 Exhibit Boyle Declaration)(Sand, Nadya)
February 7, 2012 Filing 60 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Motion To Extend Discovery 56 held on 2/7/2012 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: David Stewart; Def Counsel: Michael Sanft; Court Reporter/FTR #: 1:27-1:33; Time of Hearing: 1:30 PM; Courtroom: 3C;The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears the representations of counsel. The 56 Motion to Extend Time is granted as follows: The Close of Discovery is extended to April 16, 2012; Dispositive Motions are due by May 16, 2012; The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by June 15, 2012.All other deadlines have passed and therefore will not be extended. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
February 6, 2012 Filing 59 RESPONSE to 53 MOTION to Set Aside Sanctions Order, filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. Replies due by 2/16/2012. (Boyle, James)
January 30, 2012 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 1/30/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Smith. RE: 56 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (Third Request) - Defendant's Response, if any, is due by February 6, 2012. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
January 30, 2012 Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 1/30/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Smith. RE: 56 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (Third Request) - A Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for February 7, 2012, at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman.The parties are instructed to call telephone number: (702) 868-4921, access code: 123456, 5 minutes prior to the hearing time. The Court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
January 25, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (Third Request) by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. Motion ripe 1/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Boyle, James)
January 19, 2012 Filing 55 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 1/19/2012 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: David Stewart, brian Boschee; Def Counsel: Michael Sanft; Court Reporter/FTR #: 1:35-1:53; Time of Hearing: 1:30 PM; Courtroom: 3C; Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically is denied. The Court hears the representations of Mr. Sanft regarding his failure to appear at the December 19, 2011 hearing. Sanctions are not imposed at this time. Regarding the Discovery issues rasied at the hearing, the Court directs the parties to meet and confer. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
January 19, 2012 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Attorney: Sanft. by Defendant Marcel July. Motion ripe 1/19/2012. (Sanft, Michael)
January 18, 2012 Filing 53 MOTION to Set Aside Sanctions Order by Defendant Marcel July. Responses due by 2/4/2012. (Sanft, Michael)
December 29, 2011 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM of Fees and Costs in Support of Motion to Compel [#42] filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc. RE 49 Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru A-4: Boyle Aff., # 2 Exhibit B thru B-1: Stewart Aff., # 3 Proposed Order (Exhibit C))(Boyle, James)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDERED that Defendants and Defendants' counsel shall appear on Thursday, January 19, 2012 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman and show cause why they should not be held in contempt for failing to appear at the December 19, 2011, hearing re Plaintiff's motion to compel. FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendants and counsel fail to appear for the hearing on 1/19/12 at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 3C, the Court will enter sanctions up to and including dismissal of the complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that Defendant/Counter Claimant Julys Motion for Voluntary Dismissal 44 is GRANTED. Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.s Motion for Partial Dismissal of Counterclaims 22 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 19, 2011 Filing 49 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 42 held on 12/19/2011 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: James Boyle; Def Counsel: not present; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:31-9:43; Time of Hearing: 9:30 AM; Courtroom: 3C; Neither Defense Counsel nor the Defendant are present. The Court hears Mr. Boyle's representations regarding the Motion. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 42 is granted as follows: The Court finds that Mr. July waived his objection with his untimely response. It is ordered that Mr. July shall provide complete verified answers without objections to Caesars' interrogatories within 30 days. The Court finds that OTLLC waived their objection with their untimely response. It is ordered that OTLLC shall provide complete verified answers without objections to Interrogatories 5-8 and 14 within 30 days. The Court declines to issue an Order regarding Caesars' assertion that OTLLC's responses to Interrogatories 4, 9, and 10 contain false information.It is ordered that OTLLC and Mr. July shall verify their interrogatory responses. It is ordered that Defendants shall produce full written responses without objection to Caesars' request for production of documents within 30 days. The Court grants Plaintiff's request for sanctions. Within 10 days Plaintiff shall submit a Petition for the costs incurred regarding their attempt to obtain discovery after their initial service of discovery and the costs incurred in bringing this Motion 42 . The Court will issue an Order to Show Cause. A Show Cause Hearing is set for January 19, 2012, at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. The Defendant, Marcel July, and defense counsel must be present for the hearing. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
December 16, 2011 Filing 48 Interim STATUS REPORT (First) by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
December 15, 2011 Filing 47 NON-OPPOSITION to 44 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counterclaims Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) ; filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
December 12, 2011 Filing 46 NON-OPPOSITION to 42 MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond to Caesars' First Set of Interrogatoires and Document Requests and Declaration of Nadya Munasifi In Support Thereof ; filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boyle, James)
December 1, 2011 Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 12/1/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Smith. RE: 42 MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond to Caesars' First Set of Interrogatoires and Document Requests and Declaration of Nadya Munasifi In Support Thereof - A Motion Hearing is set for Monday, December 19, 2011, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
November 28, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counterclaims Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) by Defendants Marcel July, Octavius Tower LLC. Responses due by 12/15/2011. (Sanft, Michael)
November 17, 2011 Filing 43 ERRATA to 42 MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond to Caesars' First Set of Interrogatoires and Document Requests and Declaration of Nadya Munasifi In Support Thereof ; filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M through P)(Boyle, James)
November 17, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond to Caesars' First Set of Interrogatoires and Document Requests and Declaration of Nadya Munasifi In Support Thereof by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C, # 2 Exhibit D through F, # 3 Exhibit G through M)(Boyle, James)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Amended Stipulated SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 2/15/2012. Motions due by 3/16/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 27, 2011 Filing 40 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc. Second Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (Boyle, James)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that Defendant/Counterclaimant Marcel July's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 16 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 20, 2011 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 9/20/2011. IT IS ORDERED this matter is hereby referred to the U.S. Magistrate Judge for the scheduling of a settlement conference upon the close of discovery, which is currently January 16, 2012.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Verified Petition for Permission for Attorney David Stewart to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Attorney James Boyle as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/15/11. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 15, 2011 Filing 36 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Stewart and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-2118424) filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc. Pursuant to the Court's Order (Docket No. 35). Motion ripe 9/15/2011. (Boyle, James)
September 14, 2011 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 9/14/2011. The Court has reviewed the 33 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and is satisfied that the deficient filings were the fault only of local counsel James T. Boyle and not David J. Stewart of Alston & Bird, LLP. Therefore, the 33 Motion is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KXJ)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting 32 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/16/2012. Motions due by 2/15/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 12, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 31 Minute Order,, Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Minute Order Denying Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Stewart by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. Responses due by 9/29/2011. (Boyle, James)
September 12, 2011 Filing 32 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc. First Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (Boyle, James)
September 6, 2011 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 9/6/2011. By Deputy Clerk: PCE. Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.'s VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Stewart and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle is still incomplete and missing the party's signature on page 5. Therefore, Plaintiff's VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice is hereby DENIED without leave to amend. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PE)
August 15, 2011 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 8/15/2011. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:11-CV-0536 GMN-CWH. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 14, 2011 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Dismissal of Defendant Marcel July's Counterclaims Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) ; filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. (Boyle, James).
June 30, 2011 Filing 28 RESPONSE to 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Dismissal of Defendant Marcel July's Counterclaims Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) , filed by Counter Claimant Marcel July, Defendants Marcel July, Octavius Tower LLC. Replies due by 7/10/2011. (Sanft, Michael).
June 15, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 24 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, 17 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Stewart and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1995791) filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc. VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Stewart and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1995791) filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc. by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Boyle, James)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 11/15/2011. Motions due by 12/15/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 06/15/2011. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PE)
June 15, 2011 Filing 24 Order DENYING Verified Petition 17 for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel because it is incomplete and does not provide the required information. Counsel shall file an Amended Verified Petition within seven (7) days from the date of this minute order, or pay the appropriate filing fee again. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 06-15-2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PE)
June 14, 2011 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Marcel July, Octavius Tower LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Sanft, Michael)
June 13, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Dismissal of Defendant Marcel July's Counterclaims Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. Responses due by 6/30/2011. (Boyle, James)
June 13, 2011 Filing 21 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc. Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (Boyle, James)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Defendant Marcel shall have until 6/20/11 to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/20/2011. Defendant Octavius' show cause response/certificate of interested parties due by 6/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 6, 2011 Filing 19 RESPONSE to 16 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc., Counter Defendant Caesars World, Inc.. Replies due by 6/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Declaration)(Boyle, James)
May 23, 2011 Filing 18 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nadya Munasifi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1995821) filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. Motion ripe 5/23/2011. (Boyle, James)
May 23, 2011 Filing 17 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Stewart and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1995791) filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. Motion ripe 5/23/2011. (Boyle, James)
May 20, 2011 Filing 16 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Counter Claimant Marcel July, Defendant Marcel July. Responses due by 6/6/2011. (Sanft, Michael)
May 19, 2011 Filing 15 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/29/2011., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/3/2011.), COUNTERCLAIM against Caesars World, Inc. filed by Marcel July. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sanft, Michael)
May 19, 2011 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caesars World, Inc. re 11 Summons Issued. Caesars World, Inc. served on 4/29/2011, answer due 5/20/2011. (Boyle, James)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Defendant Octavious shall have until 5/31/2011 at 4:00pm to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 3, 2011 Filing 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by Octavius Tower LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/13/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/17/2011.(Sanft, Michael)
April 27, 2011 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Marcel July. (ECS)
April 26, 2011 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Marcel July, filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
April 25, 2011 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Marcel July. (ECS)
April 22, 2011 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Marcel July (Netherlands), filed by Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
April 15, 2011 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Caesars World, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Caesars World, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Marcel July, Other Affiliate Octavius Tower, LLC for Caesars World, Inc. added. Plaintiff Caesars World, Inc.'s Certificate of Interested Parties. (Boyle, James)
April 14, 2011 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caesars World, Inc. re 5 Summons Issued. Octavius Tower LLC served on 4/11/2011, answer due 5/2/2011. (Boyle, James)
April 11, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marcel July, Octavius Tower LLC re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ECS)
April 11, 2011 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (ECS)
April 11, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel David Stewart and Nadya Munasifi to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 5/26/2011.(no image attached) (ECS)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ECS)
April 11, 2011 Case assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ECS)
April 8, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marcel July, Octavius Tower LLC (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1947047), filed by Caesars World, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/18/2011. Proof of service due by 8/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit D-F to Complaint, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons for Marcus July, # 5 Summons for Octavius Tower LLC) (Boyle, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caesars World, Inc. v. July et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caesars World, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Nadya Munasifi
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: David J. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcel July
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octavius Tower LLC , NV
Represented By: Michael W Sanft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?