RES-NV CHLV, LLC v. Shull

Plaintiff: RES-NV CHLV, LLC , FL
Defendant: Harry H Shull , NV
Case Number: 2:2011cv00593
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 34 Application for Judgment Debtor Examination. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Judgment Debtor, Harry H. Shull, shall appear and be examined under oath on 06/28/2016, at 10:00 a.m., at the offices of Snell & Wilmer L.L. P. Judgment Debtor Harry H. Shull, shall refrain from effectuating any transfer of or interference with any of his property that is not exempt from execution. A copy of this order shall be personally served upon the Judgment Debtor at least fourteen (14) calendar days before the judgment debtor examination scheduled herein and proof of service filed with the Court. Failure to appear may subject the Judgment Debtor to punishment for contempt of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 04/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 17, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Plaintiff's Application for Judgment Debtor Exam. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Judgment Debtor Harry H. Shull shall appear and be examined under oath on 02/20/2013 at 10:00 AM at the offices of Lionel Sawyer & Collins. Judgmen t Debtor Harry H. Shull shall refrain from effectuating any transfer of or interference with any of his property that is not exempt from execution. A copy of this order shall be personally served upon the judgment debtor at least 14 calendar days before the hearing scheduled herein and proof of service filed with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 10, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of RES-NV CHLV, LLC against Harry H Shull. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 2/10/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 23, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of RES-NV CHLV, LLC against Harry H Shull. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 12/23/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RES-NV CHLV, LLC v. Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RES-NV CHLV, LLC , FL
Represented By: Ketan D Bhirud
Represented By: Todd E. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry H Shull , NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?