Stabley v. Bank Of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Garth E Stabley
Defendant: Bank Of America NA, CTC Real Estate Services, CountryWide Financial Corp and Recontrust Co., NA
Case Number: 2:2011cv00635
Filed: April 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 30 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that 41 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment 39 and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 34 are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/11/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss 6 is GRANTED, without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to file an Amended Complaint consistent with this opinion, he must do so by Friday, February 3, 2012; otherwise, the case will be closed. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that a Pretrial Conference is set for 6/3/2011 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Garth E. Stabley is required to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Plaintiff by certified mail #7007 2560 0001 6766 9112 - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stabley v. Bank Of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America NA
Represented By: Diana S. Erb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTC Real Estate Services
Represented By: Diana S. Erb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CountryWide Financial Corp
Represented By: Diana S. Erb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Co., NA
Represented By: Diana S. Erb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garth E Stabley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?