Garity v. APWU-AFl-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Rosemary Garity
Defendant: APWU Local #7156 and APWU-AFl-CIO
Case Number: 2:2011cv01109
Filed: July 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER that Defendant APWU National Labor Organization's 182 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of APWU National Labor Organization and against Rosemary Garity. Plaintiff's 188 Motion to Strike is Denied and APWU's 204 Motion to Strike is Denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER that Magistrate Judge Hoffman's decision is Affirmed in its entirety and the Plaintiff's 187 Objection is Denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Granting 199 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Reply due by 9/21/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant APWU-AFI-CIO's 149 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony. Dr. Gregory Brown is not excluded. Proposed expert Patricia Barnes is excluded. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that Rosemary Garity is removed from the Pilot Pro Bono program. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Mai Tieu - SLD)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Referring Case to the Pro Bono Program. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall also forward this order to the Pro Bono Liaison. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED for a period of 30 days to allow the Pro Bono Program to attempt to locate counsel for plaintiff Rosemary Garity. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: pro bono liaison - TR)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting 91 and 95 Motions to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court shall forthwith enter judgment in favor of Defendant APWU-AFL-CIO and against Plaintiff Rosemary Garity. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting 116 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 121 Motion to Reschedule Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro re 91 and 95 MOTIONS to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/18/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Denying 114 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Denying 100 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/14/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Denying without prejudice 89 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 85 Motion to Drop Defendant Local #7156 from this Action and to Allow Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/31/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 57 and 60 Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint. The Motions are GRANTED as to Plaintiffs claims of hostile work environment, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and violations of 42 U.S.C. § 1985and § 1986. The Motions are DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/18/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that Defendant APWU-AFL-CIOs Motion to Dismiss 11 is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice as to said Defendant. Defendant APWU Local #7156's Motion to Dismiss 15 is GRANTED without prejudice. P laintiff Rosemary Garity shall have an additional 30 days, to and including November 28, 2011, within which to file a Proposed Amended Complaint and thereafter to effect proper service on Defendants. Failure to do so will result in a conversion of this Order from dismissal without prejudice to dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear for Attorney Anton G. Hajjar for APWU Local #7156. Richard McCracken Designated as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying 21 Motion for Default Judgment and Granting 25 Motion to File its Motion to Dismiss One Day Out of Time. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/16/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Extend Deadline. APWU Local #7156 and APWU-AFl-CIO answer due 8/8/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garity v. APWU-AFl-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APWU Local #7156
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APWU-AFl-CIO
Represented By: Anton Hajjar
Represented By: Richard G. McCracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Garity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?