Feagins et al v. Trump Organization et al
Plaintiff: Andre Feagins, Jonathan Feagins, Joshua Feagins, Kevin Feagins, Kevin Feagins, Jr and Yolanda Feagins
Defendant: Otis Elevator Co., Trump International Hotel & Tower - Las Vegas Unit Owners Association, Trump Organization, Trump Ruffin Commercial LLC and Trump Ruffin Tower I, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01121
Filed: July 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court GRANTS the Motion for Reconsideration, (ECF No. 196 ). The Court finds that it has jurisdiction to rule on the Petition for Compromise of Minors' Claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Petition, (ECF No. 191 ). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER that 176 Motion for New Trial is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 44 Defendant Otis Elevator Company's Motion for Summary Judgment and 45 Trump Ruffin Tower I LLC's Joinder. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED Order Denying 72 Plaintiffs' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 74 and 76 Defendants' Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Sanctions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying 72 Plaintiffs' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 74 and 76 Defendants' Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Sanctions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Denying 67 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 4 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Motion to Strike is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED pend ing Plaintiffs' compliance with the provisions of NRS 18.130, or upon further order of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until 4/2/12 to either file a motion requesting in forma pauperis status, or to submit a bond pursuant t o NRS 18.130 in the amount of $500.00 per defendant from each plaintiff. Failure to do so by Monday, April 2, 2012, shall constitute grounds for dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feagins et al v. Trump Organization et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Feagins
Represented By: Bradley Paul Elley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Feagins
Represented By: Bradley Paul Elley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Feagins
Represented By: Bradley Paul Elley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Feagins
Represented By: Bradley Paul Elley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Feagins, Jr
Represented By: Bradley Paul Elley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Feagins
Represented By: Bradley Paul Elley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Elevator Co.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mastrangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump International Hotel & Tower - Las Vegas Unit Owners Association
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: David B. Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump Organization
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: David B. Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump Ruffin Commercial LLC
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: David B. Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump Ruffin Tower I, LLC
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: David B. Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?