Nassif et al v. Supervalu, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Janet Nassif and Thomas Nassif |
Defendant: |
Albertson's LLC, New Albertson's Inc. and Supervalu, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv01273 |
Filed: |
August 8, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert J. Johnston |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 31, 2012 |
Filing
51
ORDER that Defendants Request for Sanctions in the Form of Attorneys Fees and Costs related to Defendants Motion for Sanctions 24 as supplemented by the Affidavit of Josh Cole Aicklen, Esq. 43 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 12/31/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER that 24 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Economic Experts and Evidence of Lost Earning, Loss of Earning Capacity and Loss of Household Services is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before November 15, 2012, Defendant shall file an affida vit of fees and costs incurred in bringing the Motion (#24). FURTHER ORDERED that a response to the affidavit of fees and costs, if any, shall be filed on or before November 20, 2012. FURTHER ORDERED that Hearing on the Request Sanctions in Form of A ttorney's Fees and Costs (#24) is scheduled for 11/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 11/5/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 17, 2012 |
Filing
23
ORDER Granting 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action for Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing
18
ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint Interim Discovery Status Report on March 16, 2012 which shall contain the items enumerated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 2/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 26, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER that the parties shall file a joint Interim Discovery Status Report on 12/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?