Zizi v. U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston, 2005-10, by its Attorney in Fact Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Successor by Merger to Well Fargo Home Mortgage Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tsadok Zizi
Defendant: MERS, Servicelink, U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston, 2005-10, by its Attorney in Fact Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Successor by Merger to Well Fargo Home Mortgage Inc. and America's Servicing Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv01511
Filed: September 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leens report and recommendation 7 is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Plaintiffs complaint 1 is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Accordingly, plaintiffs remaining motion to stay is denied as moot. The clerk shall dismiss the complaint and close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiffs Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 1 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a blank application, and Plaintiff shall have until November 4, 2011, in which to submit the completed applicatio n or pay the $350.00 filing fee. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation to the district judge for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, form to plaintiff)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zizi v. U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston, 2005-10, by its Attorney in Fact Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Successor by Merger to Well Fargo Home Mortgage Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicelink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston, 2005-10, by its Attorney in Fact Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Successor by Merger to Well Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsadok Zizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?