Charleston and Jones, LLC et al v. Uponor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Charleston and Jones, LLC and Copper Creek II, LLC |
Defendant: |
Western States Plumbing, Inc., Viega, Inc., Viega, LLC, Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc., Viega NA, Inc., Uponor North America, Inc., Uponor, Inc., Uponor Corporation, Uponor Group and RCR Plumbing & Mechanical |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv01637 |
Filed: |
October 10, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Kent J. Dawson |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Prop. Damage Prod. Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 16, 2014 |
Filing
68
ORDER that 67 Motion for Relief is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
64
ORDER Granting 32 Defendants' Motion to Sever Claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the new and separate action against Vanguard Piping Systems, Viega, LLC, Viega Inc., and Viega NA be filed within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 05/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
57
ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Stay. This action is stayed pending the opinion and mandate in Ninth Ciruit Case No. 10-15439, except as to 32 Pending Motion to Sever Claims. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
February 9, 2012 |
Filing
52
ORDER Denying Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by MDL Panel on 2/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Charleston and Jones, LLC et al v. Uponor, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Western States Plumbing, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Viega, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Patricia K. Lundvall |
Represented By: |
Amanda C Yen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Viega, LLC |
Represented By: |
Patricia K. Lundvall |
Represented By: |
Amanda C Yen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Patricia K. Lundvall |
Represented By: |
Amanda C Yen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Viega NA, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Patricia K. Lundvall |
Represented By: |
Amanda C Yen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Uponor North America, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Peter C Brown |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Uponor, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Peter C Brown |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Uponor Corporation |
Represented By: |
Peter C Brown |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Uponor Group |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: RCR Plumbing & Mechanical |
Represented By: |
R. Scott Rasmussen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Charleston and Jones, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert T. Robbins |
Represented By: |
James W Pengilly |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Copper Creek II, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert T. Robbins |
Represented By: |
James W Pengilly |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?