Wilson v. Holder et al

Plaintiff: S Rowan Wilson
Defendant: Arthur Herbert, Eric H. Holder, Jr., B Todd Jones, The U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv01679
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 12, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Motion to File First Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint due within 14 days. Motions due within 45 days after service of the amended pleading. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 21, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Dismiss Individual-Capacity Claims. Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Holder, Jones, and Herbert in their individual capacities are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 24, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear for Attorney Alicia N. Ellington,Zachary C Richter, and John K. Theis for United States of America. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Holder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Todd Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S Rowan Wilson
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?