September 14, 2023 |
Filing
170
ORDER Granting 169 Motion for Leave to File Document re 164 Reply. Responses due by 10/2/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
|
July 14, 2023 |
Filing
166
ORDER granting ECF No. 165 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have until and including August 28, 2023, to file their response to Petitioner's reply (ECF No. 164 ). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
|
April 13, 2023 |
Filing
163
ORDER Granting 162 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to 160 Answer to Habeas Petition re 90 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Replies due by 5/31/2023.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), Will iam Gittere is substituted for William Reubart, as the respondent warden. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket to reflect this change. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
November 8, 2022 |
Filing
159
ORDER Granting 158 Motion to Extend Time to file amended answer. Aaron Ford answer due 11/21/2022; William Reubart answer due 11/21/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
July 27, 2022 |
Filing
155
ORDER Granting 154 Motion to Extend Time. Aaron Ford and William Reubart answer due 9/23/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
May 25, 2022 |
Filing
152
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Respondents will have 60 days from the date of this order to file an amended answer. Petitioner will have 150 days from the filing of the amended answer, or from the due date for the amended answer if Petitioner d oes not file one, to file a reply. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered November 26, 2018 (ECF No. 85 ) will remain in effect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Proce dure 25(d), William Reubart is substituted for William Gittere as the respondent warden, and Aaron Ford is substituted for Catherine Cortez Masto as the respondent attorney general. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket to reflect these changes. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
February 25, 2022 |
Filing
150
ORDER Granting 149 Motion to Extend Time - Answers due 2/28/2022. Replies due 200 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing
145
ORDER Granting 143 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 90 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 2/23/2022. Petitioner will then have 150 days to file his reply. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the 85 Order will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
January 14, 2022 |
Filing
142
ORDER granting 141 Motion to Extend Time re: 90 Petition for Writ. Answers are now due 1/27/2022. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the 85 Order entered November 26, 2018 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
November 30, 2021 |
Filing
140
ORDER granting 139 Motion to Extend Time Re: 90 Petition for Writ of Respondents' Answer(s) due 1/13/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
November 1, 2021 |
Filing
138
ORDER Granting 137 Motion to Extend Time Respondents have until 11/29/2021 to file their Answer. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the 85 order will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
September 14, 2021 |
Filing
136
ORDER Granting 135 Motion to Extend Time. Catherine Cortez Masto, William Gittere answer due 10/28/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
July 14, 2021 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting 133 Motion to Extend Time Re: 90 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Respondents answer(s) are due 9/13/2021. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered November 26, 2018 (ECF No. 85) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
May 17, 2021 |
Filing
132
ORDER granting 131 Motion to Extend Time to Respond Re: 90 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Renee Baker answer due 7/13/2021; Catherine Cortez Masto answer due 7/13/2021; William Gittere answer due 7/13/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
January 15, 2021 |
Filing
130
ORDER denying without prejudice 105 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying without prejudice 115 , 116 Motion for Discovery and Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the respondents will have until May 14, 2021 to file an an swer to 90 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered November 26, 2018 (ECF No. 85 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
August 25, 2020 |
Filing
124
ORDER granting 123 Motion to Extend Time; The respondents shall have up to and including 8/28/2020, in which to file the Replies to 105 motion to dismiss petitioner Curtis Guys, 90 amended petition, and responses to the 116 motion for evidentiary hearing and 115 motion for discovery. Replies due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
August 12, 2020 |
Filing
122
ORDER granting 121 Motion to Extend Time. The respondents shall have up to and including 8/24/2020, in which to file the reply in support of the 105 motion to dismiss petitioner Curtis Guys 90 amended petition, and responses to the 116 motion for evidentiary hearing and 115 motion for discovery. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
June 22, 2020 |
Filing
118
ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Extend Time. The respondents will have until 8/3/2020 to file a reply in support of their 105 motion to dismiss, a response to 115 the motion for leave to conduct discovery, and a response to 116 the motion for evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 5, 2020 |
Filing
114
ORDER granting 113 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Reply to the 111 Response to the 105 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 6/18/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
January 2, 2020 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting 107 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 105 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
October 31, 2019 |
Filing
102
ORDER Granting Respondents' 101 Motion to Extend Time Re: 90 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 17, 2019 |
Filing
100
ORDER Granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time Re: 90 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents have until 10/30/2019 to respond. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 17, 2019 |
Filing
98
ORDER Granting Respondents' 97 Motion to Extend Time Re: 90 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents have until 10/16/2019 to respond to 90 Second Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
August 14, 2019 |
Filing
96
ORDER Granting 95 Motion to Extend Time Re: 90 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The respondents will have until and including 9/16/19, to respond to the second amended habeas petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
February 19, 2019 |
Filing
88
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 87 First Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Second Amended Habeas Petition due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 26, 2018 |
Filing
85
ORDER that Petitioner is Granted leave to file a Second Amended Petition within 90 days from the date of this Order (see Order for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 11, 2018 |
Filing
81
ORDER that the stay of this action is lifted. Within 15 days from the entry of this order the petitioner shall file a brief re proper course of further proceedings in this case. Respondents have 15 days to file a responsive brief. Petitioner has sev en days to file a reply brief.William Gittere is substituted for Renee Baker as the respondent warden. The Clerk of the Court shall update the docket for this case to reflect that substitution. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER Granting 56 Motion to Stay and Abey Federal Action. Denying as moot 41 Motion to Dismiss. Status Reports due by 12/15/2013, 6/15/2014, and 12/15/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
November 16, 2012 |
Filing
39
ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Compliance with Scheduling Order. Answer or Response to 17 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus shall be filed within 60 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/16/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 10, 2012 |
Filing
27
ORDER that the motion for substitution of counsel 21 is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada is discharged from the representation of the petitioner in this case. The Federal Public Defender for the Central District of C alifornia is appointed to represent the petitioner in this case. The Federal Public Defender for the Central District of California shall, within 30 days after the date this order, file a Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Petitioner, indicating the ir acceptance of this appointment, or other document indicating that they cannot accept the appointment. The requirements of Local Rule IA 10-2 (Admission to Practice in a Particular Case) shall be waived in this case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/10/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, cc: Curtis Guy, FPD-CD/CA)
|
February 9, 2012 |
Filing
13
ORDER Setting a Litigation Schedule. Amended Petition due by 4/16/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/9/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
December 19, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER THAT a telephonic status conference is scheduled for February 2, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for petitioner and counsel for respondents shall call 702-868-4912, approximately five minutes before the commencement of the conference. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
November 15, 2011 |
Filing
5
ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a Supplement to the Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent petitioner. FPD shall have 30 days from the entry of this order to undertake representation or indicate to the court its inability. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that Clerk of Court shall SERVE a copy of this order on Michael Pescetta, Capital Habeas Division, Office of the Federal Public Defender. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall SERVE the respondents, by certified mail, wit h a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus. Respondents counsel shall file a notice of appearance of counsel within 30 days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: petitioner and Michael Pescetta. Respondents served petition and this order by certified mail - EDS)
|