The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Riverwalk Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Defendant: Riverwalk Tower Unit-Owners Association, Shevach, Inc., Supreme Plumbing, Inc., Riverwalk Development, LLC, A.C.E. Architects, Inc. and National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv02033
Filed: December 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), the Clerk of Court shall enter final Judgment in favor of Plaintiff The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania and against Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company on Co unt One of the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. The Clerk of Court further shall enter final Judgment in favor of Plaintiff The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania and against Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company on Count Two of the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment only to the extent Count Two seeks a declaration that there are multiple occurrences alleged in the underlying case. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that 71 Motion to Alter/Amend the Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 and/or for Relief under Fed. R. Civ. P. 60 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant National Fire and Marine Insurance Company shall have until July 12, 2013 to file a response to 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Count III Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Denying 38 Rule 56(d) Motion to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Granting 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Clerk Shall Enter Judgment Accordingly. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Count Three without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Riverwalk Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverwalk Tower Unit-Owners Association
Represented By: Timothy S. Menter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shevach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Plumbing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverwalk Development, LLC
Represented By: Scott A Glogovac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C.E. Architects, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jeremy R Alberts
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?