March 7, 2016 |
Filing
398
ORDER that 397 Unopposed Motion Regarding Deadline to Seek Attorney Fees and Costs is GRANTED. Bill for Taxation of Costs and/or Motion Claiming Attorney fees due by 3/31/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 6, 2015 |
Filing
391
ORDER that 390 Spectrum's Motion to Stay Costs and Petition for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 25, 2015 |
Filing
368
AMENDED ORDER. This Amended Order is being filed for the sole purpose of correcting a typographical error in the patent number. All other aspects of the original Order filed on February 20, 2015 at ECF No. 365 , remain in full force and effect. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/25/15. Nunc Pro Tunc Date: February 20, 2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
365
ORDER that Plaintiffs' request for an order pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(e)(4 (A) that the effective date of any approval of Sandoz's ANDA shall not be earlier than the expiration date of the '829 patent, is hereby DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that judgment is entered fully in favor of Defendant Sandoz. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 20, 2015 |
Filing
358
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Bench Trial (Day 5) held on 1/20/2015 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Michael Zadina; Pla Counsel: Michael McCue, Amanda Antons, Mark Izraelewicz, and Thomas Ross; Def Counsel: Da vid Doyle, Anders Aannestad, Eric Acker, and James Cekola; Court Reporter/FTR #: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 1:04-2:49 PM; Courtroom: 7D; Closing arguments presented. The Court takes the matter under submission. Post-trial briefs due by 2/13/2015. Status Hearing set for 3/5/2015 at 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
January 16, 2015 |
Filing
355
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Bench Trial held on 1/16/2015 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Michael Zadina; Pla Counsel: Michael McCue, Amanda Antons, Mark Izraelewicz, and Thomas Ross; Def Counsel: David Doyl e, Anders Aannestad, Eric Acker,James Cekola, and John Lanham; Court Reporter/FTR #: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 1:08-4:24 PM; Courtroom: 7D; IT IS ORDERED that 350 Motion in Limine is denied without prejudice. De fendant's witness(es): James E. Krook and Ryan Sullivan. Exhibits admitted. Status Hearing set for 3/5/2015 at 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Bench Trial continued to 1/20/2015 at 1:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing
343
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Bench Trial (Day 1) held on 1/12/2015 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Michael Zadina; Pla Counsel: Michael McCue, Amanda Antons, Mark Izraelewicz, and Thomas Ross; Def Counsel: Da vid Doyle, Anders Aannestad, Eric Acker, and Rochelle Dede; Court Reporter/FTR #: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 8:38 AM to 2:37 PM; Courtroom: 7D; IT IS ORDERED that 337 Motion to Seal is granted. Plaintiff's witness(es): Colin J. Suckling, Ph.D. Exhibits admitted. Bench Trial continued to 1/13/2015 at 8:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
329
ORDER Temporarily Unsealing Transcripts re Hearing held 1/6/15. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 29, 2014 |
Filing
314
ORDER that 296 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT, within one day of serving the opposing party in the Eurohealth Litigation with Mr. Henel's expert statement, Plaintiffs must file unredacted versions of Defendant's motion in limine and Exhibits 1-2 on the public docket in the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing
275
ORDER granting 268 Motion to Seal 267 Declaration and 265 Reply to Response to Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the documents at Docket 264 and 266 shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
274
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 261 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as to Exhibits 1 and 8 attached to the Declaration of Amanda K. Antons. Docket Nos. 254 and 258 shall remain sealed. Plaintiffs shall file redacted versions of these two exhibits no later than 8/26/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, as to Exhibits 5-7 and 9-10 attached to the Declaration of Amanda K. Ant ons. Docket Nos. 255 to 257 and 259 to 260 shall remain under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, as to the redactions in 251 Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Docket No. [252 shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing
273
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 249 Defendant's Motion to Seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to seal is DENIED in part, as to the portions redacted in 245 Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Th e Court hereby ORDERED that 245 Opposition shall be unsealed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to seal is GRANTED in part, as to Exhibit 14 to 248 Declaration of John R. Lanham. Docket No. 248 shall remain under seal at this time. The C ourt further ORDERS that, within one day of serving the opposing party in the Ben Venue Litigation with this report, Plaintiffs must file Exhibit 14 on the public docket in the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing
242
ORDER Granting 239 Motion to Seal Exhibit to the Declaration of Amanda K. Antons in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Docket No. 238 shall therefore remain under seal at this time. The Court further ORDERS that, within one day of serving the opposing party in the Ben Venue Litigation with this report, Plaintiffs must file Exhibit 5 on the public docket in the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing
226
ORDER that 224 Joint Motion for Status Conference is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing
225
ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment 140 , 146 , and 150 are STRICKEN. FURTHER ORDERED that 213 Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Dispositive Motions Deadline is extended until June 30, 2014, for the limited purpose of allowing each party to file a Motion for Summary Judgment that complies with Local Rule 7-4. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 25, 2014 |
Filing
220
ORDER Granting 216 Defendant's Motion to Seal. Docket Nos. 212 and 214 shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 8, 2014 |
Filing
202
ORDER correcting a clerical error in the original Order filed on December 31, 2013 at ECF 199 , as follows: on page 8, FN1, diastereoisomer is corrected to read diastereoisbmer. All other aspects of the original Order remain the same. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/8/14. NUNC PRO TUNC DATE: December 31, 2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 31, 2013 |
Filing
199
ORDER that the proposed construction of the nine (9) terms submitted by the parties are construed as contained within this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that claims 13 and 14 are both dependent claims. Claim 13 depends from claim 11. Claim 14 depends from claim 10. FURTHER ORDERED that claim 13 is invalid as improperly dependent from claim 11. FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for the setting of the Post-Claim Construction Order Settlement Conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.1-19(b). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/31/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 26, 2013 |
Filing
197
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 175 Defendant's Motion to Seal. The motion is GRANTED with respect to the sealing of Exhibits Defendants proposed redaction of Exhibits 12, 18, 36 and 47. The motion is DENIED with respect to th e sealing of Exhibits 2, 5, 22, 30, 32-35, 37, 39, 41, 44, and 45. Docket 168 will remain under seal, but Defendant is ordered to file the unsealed exhibits on the public docket no later than 1/10/14. With regard to the Roberts Declaration, the mo tion is DENIED. The Court orders 164 unsealed. With regard to the Cekola Declaration, the motion to seal is GRANTED. Docket 160 shall remain under seal. With regard to the Martin Declaration, the motion to seal is DENIED. The Court orders [17 1] unsealed. With regard to the responses to the motions for summary judgment and the Declarations, the motion to seal is DENIED. Defendant is ordered to file, no later than 1/15/2014, newly-redacted versions of those responses and Declarations, consistent with the Court's instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 17, 2013 |
Filing
190
ORDER Denying without prejudice 187 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 13, 2013 |
Filing
182
ORDER re 175 MOTION to Seal. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED, no later than December 20, 2013, to either file a declaration establishing compelling reasons for the sealing of each document at issue, or withdraw the designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
178
ORDER re 175 MOTION to Seal filed by Sandoz Inc. Defendant shall file no later than 12/11/13 either a declaration establishing compelling reasons for the sealing of each document at issue, or withdraw the designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
November 7, 2013 |
Filing
156
ORDER Granting 155 Declaration of Anders Aennestad in Support of Sealing Portions of 155 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing
152
ORDER Amending 42 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
134
ORDER Denying 100 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Inequitable Conduct Counterclaim and Affirmative Defense. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 22, 2012 |
Filing
42
PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/22/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|