Crawford v. United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 711
Plaintiff: Milton O Crawford
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 711
Case Number: 2:2012cv00121
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that 22 Motion for Continuance is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than January 14, 2013 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 08/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall not be required to pay the filing fee of $350. The Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint is D ISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/20/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 08/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 711
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 711
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton O Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?