Crawford v. Smith's Food and Drug Store Inc
Plaintiff: Milton O Crawford
Defendant: Smith's Food and Drug Store Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv00122
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER denying 310 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 311 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 313 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 314 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 315 Motion for Leave to File Document; Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER denying 305 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 306 Motion for Leave to File Document; Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER denying 298 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 299 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 301 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 302 Motion for Leave to File Document; Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER denying 280 Motion for Transcripts; denying 276 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER Granting 288 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James E. Ji terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Court certifies that Plaintiff's appeal is frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is revoked for purposes of this appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Court of Appeals - ADR)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 251 , 252 , 253 , 254 , 255 , 256 , 257 , and 258 Motions. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 01/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Denying 249 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER Denying 234 , 235 , and 241 Motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is deemed a vexatious litigant, and that any future Motions filed by Plaintiff in this action shall be summarily denied unless Plaintiff has been given express leave from the Court to file them. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER Denying 218 , 219 , and 220 Motions to Reconsider. It is Further Ordered that 222 Motion for Sanctions is Denied. It is Further Ordered that 227 and 229 Motions to Require Separate Filings are Denied as Moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER Denying 203 , 204 , and 205 Motions to Reconsider Order. Denying as moot 209 Motion to Stay and 215 Motion for Status Check. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Accepting and Adopting in full 194 Report and Recommendation. Granting 182 Motion for Terminating Sanctions. Plaintiffs claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Denying without prejudice 164 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Granting 148 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff Milton Crawford is ordered to pay Defendant Kroger the sum total of $3,578.75. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Denying without prejudice 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Denying 140 MOTION for Judge Reassignment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Denying 122 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; Denying 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; Denying 128 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Default Judgment; and Granting 127 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 09/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting 64 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default; Denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Default; Denying 99 Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment; Denying 109 Plaintiff's Motion Judgment by Default; Denying 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment by Default; and Denying 102 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 05/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 30 Order on Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court hereby corrects its 06/25/2012, 30 Order dismissing Plaintiffs claim for age discrimina tion, as stated on page 5, line 15. Instead of wage, gender and age the Order should state wage and gender at line 15. An Amended Order incorporating this correction is attached hereto as Exhibit A for reference. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting 100 Defendants' Motion for Clarification on Scope of Order Granting Stay. The Courts 85 Order stayed all of the deadlines in the Courts 51 Scheduling Order, including the February 13, 2013 deadline for filing dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 01/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 12/18/2012. RE: 96 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification. The Court advises Plaintiff Crawford that the Courts Order that the Mandate be spread upon the records of this Co urt is essentially an order taking judicial notice in this case of the fact that the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issued an opinion in that case, so that now that order is part of the record in this instant case. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance of Discovery pending ruling on 32 and 57 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Ruling. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 44 Plaintiff's Motion Initiating Scheduling Meeting is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Pre-trial Discovery Conference is set for 9/7/2012 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ACCEPTING 15 Report and Recommendation, in full, to the extent that it is not inconsistent with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims for wage, gender and age discrimination and intentional infliction of emotional distress shall be DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/25/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Submit Offer of Proof. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Motion for Extension is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend by 4/9/12. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Delivery of Complaint and Summons is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 3/8/2012 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Plaintiff is required to appea r at this hearing. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the Plaintiff by certified mail, return receipt requested and via regular mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: certified mail #7009 0960 0000 4100 7542 and via regular mail - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Smith's Food and Drug Store Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton O Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food and Drug Store Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?