Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Southern Terrace Homeowners Association |
Defendant: |
Uponor Wirsbo Company, Zenith of Nevada, Inc., Uponor, Inc., VG Pipe, LLC, Vanguard Industries, Inc., Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc., Viega GmbH & Co., KG, Viega International GMBH, Viega, Inc., Viega, LLC, Wirsbo Company, Uponor Corporation and Meritage Homes of Nevada Inc |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv00206 |
Filed: |
February 8, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Nature of Suit: |
Prop. Damage Prod. Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 8, 2013 |
Filing
176
ORDER that all claims related to the Vanguard/Viega plumbing system are SEVERED from the following cases: Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc. , No. 2:12-cv-207. FURTHER ORDERED that the Vanguard/Viega claims severed from the Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-2 07 actions are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including discovery and trial, as member cases into the lead Vanguard/Viega case Waterfall Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:11-cv-1498. FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery in the consolidated Uponor/Wirsbo and Vanguard/Viega actions shall be coordinated to the greatest extent possible so as to minimize the expense and burden on all parties in these actions.FURTHER ORDERED that all further Vanguard/Viega-related plead ings and papers shall be filed in the lead Vanguard/Viega case only. Plaintiffs in the lead Vanguard/Viega case shall have leave to file a consolidated amended complaint within 10 days of entry of this order. The amended complaint shall not add addit ional legal theories and shall conform to all of the Courts prior orders in the Waterfall action.FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter this Order into the dockets of this action, the lead Vanguard case, and the two Vanguard member cases. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 25, 2012 |
Filing
170
ORDER Granting 153 Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay. This case shall be stayed pending decision on the motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 09/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
August 3, 2012 |
Filing
155
ORDER Denying 137 Motion to to Transfer for lack of jurisdiction and Denying 135 Motion to Extend Time re 1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 07/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
145
ORDER Granting 92 Motion to Stay and Granting 98 Motion to Stay Discovery to the extent that a temporary stay is entered pending a decision concerning whether this action will be transferred for consolidated pre-trial proceedings to Chief Judge Jones and Magistrate Judge George W. Foley. Counsel for the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of decision on the request to transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 07/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 10, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record 73 is GRANTED. Elaine K. Fresch and Gil Glancz of Selman Breitman LLP will continue to represent Defendant Zenith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?