Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Maui One Excavating, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Saving Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust and Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund |
Defendant: |
Tasey Miyahira, Maui One Excavating, Inc. and Paitaka P. Miyahira |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv00338 |
Filed: |
February 29, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Kent J. Dawson |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert J. Johnston |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: E.R.I.S.A. |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 7, 2013 |
Filing
37
ORDER Sanctioning Gary Branton. The Court SANCTIONS Mr. Branton personally in the amount of $300, pursuant to Federal Rule 16(f) and Local Rule IA 4-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 26, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER that a Motion Hearing is set for 3/11/2013 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe re 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary G. Branton. Defendants Maui One Excavating, Inc., Paitaka Miyahira and Tasey Miyahi ra are hereby ordered to attend the hearing. Any new counsel retained to represent Defendants in this matter is also ordered to attend. THERE WILL BE NO EXCEPTIONS TO THESE APPEARANCE REQUIREMENTS. No later than February 28, 2013, Mr. Branton shall n otify Defendants of this order that they appear and shall file a proof of service. With respect to Defendant Maui One Excavating, Inc., the Court wishes to highlight that it must retain counsel expeditiously as corporations may appear in federal court only through licensed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 22, 2013 |
Filing
29
SECOND ORDER to Show Cause Why Gary Branton Should Not Be Sanctioned. The Court hereby ORDERS attorney Gary Branton to show cause in writing, no later than February 28, 2013, why the Court should not issue sanctions against him in an amount up to &# 036;5,000 pursuant to Local Rule IA 4-1, Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f), the Court's inherent authority and/or 18 U.S.C. § 1927. The Court further ORDERS Mr. Branton to file, no later than February 23, 2013, a declaration indicating whether, and the manner in which, he notified Defendants of the Court order that they appear on February 21, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing
26
ORDER re 24 Order to Show Cause. The Court will not issue sanctions and hereby DISCHARGES the order to show cause. The Court expects Mr. Branton to fully comply with Court order in the future. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing
17
ORDER that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 90 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 6, 2012 |
Filing
12
ORDER that Plaintiffs file a status report, motion for entry of default, or notice of voluntary dismissal no later than August 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?