Hernandez v. Indymac Bank et al
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Indymac Bank, Indymac Federal Bank FBS, OneWest Bank, FSB and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv00369
Filed: March 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying ECF No. 157 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider and Alter or Amend. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 142 Motion to Modify 139 Order on Defendants' 125 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Report. If Plaintiff elects to use Mr. Gallagher as an expert witness, he must pa y $1,632.00 to Defendants OneWest Bank, F.S.B. and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company by 3/18/2016. Plaintiff's 146 Motion to Clarify 145 Order is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER that the Clerk of Court must unseal Plaintiff's 146 Ex Parte Request to Clarify Order Filed 2/1/2016 Referencing Request to Modify Order on Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that the Clerk of Court must unseal Plaintiff Jose Hernandez's Ex Parte Request to Modify Order on Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Expert Report (ECF No. 142 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall strike Plaintiff's 123 Expert Disclosures/Reports from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying 7 Defendant Quality Loan Servicing Corporations Motion to Dismiss. Denying 22 Defendants Deutsche Bank and OneWest, FSBs Motion to Dismiss. Denying 48 Plaintiff Jose Hernandezs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/31/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 39 Motion for TRO. Part B.2 (pages 7-8) of 27 Order is VACATED. Granting 43 MOTION to Extend Time to File Replies to 39 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Opening brief due within 10 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 11 Emergency EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin Trustee's Sale and Foreclosure and 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jose Hernandez. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/8/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition. Denying 17 Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition. Responses to 7 MOTION to Dismiss are due by 4/11/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/4/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Indymac Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Federal Bank FBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M Hunter
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Ross H. Moynihan
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?