Redeker v. Neven et al
Petitioner: Arie Robert Redeker
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and D. W. Neven
Case Number: 2:2012cv00397
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 56 Motion to Extend Time re 28 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Arie Robert Redeker reply due 11/6/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Extend Time to Reply to 51 Answer to Amended Habeas Petition. Reply due by 10/12/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Motion to Extend Time to Reply to 51 Answer. Reply due by 8/31/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Extend Time to respond to 28 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents answer due 6/17/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 28 Amended Petition. Respondents answer due 5/18/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 42 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. It is further ordered that respondents shall file and serve an answer to remaining grounds of the second amended petition within 30 of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss. Response due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Petition. Petitioner shall have 90 days to file and serve second amended petition. Respondents shall have 30 days after service within which to answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitio ner shall have 30 days to serve reply to answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits shall be forwarded - for this case - to the staff attorneys in Reno. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that counsel for petitioner shall meet with petitioner as soon as reasonably possible. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have 90 days to file and serve an amended petition. Respondents shall have 30 days after service of amended petition within which to file an answer. If answer filed, petitioner shall have 30 days to reply. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 9 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order Denying Appointment of Counsel. Federal Public Defender appointed as counsel for Petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the Federal Public Defend er for the district of Nevada a copy of this order, together with 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and its attachments. FPD shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to file a notice of appearance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Respondents' Motion for Leave to File a Late Response is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Clerk shall File and Electronically Serve the petition upon the respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 45 days from the entry of this order within which to answer. I f answer is filed, petitioner shall have 45 days from the date of service of answer to file a reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 4 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redeker v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Jeffrey M Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. W. Neven
Represented By: Jeffrey M Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arie Robert Redeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?