Millennium Drilling Co., Inc. v. House-Meyers et al
Plaintiff: Millennium Drilling Co., Inc.
Defendant: Beverly House-Meyers Revocable Trust, Grace Mae Properties, LLC, Molly Kay Hamrick, Robert H. Hamrick, Hamrick Trust and Beverly House-Meyers
Case Number: 2:2012cv00462
Filed: March 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER that the judgment entered pursuant to the jury verdict (ECF No. 328 ) is vacated; Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants on Plaintiff's claims relating to Falcon; the Hamrick Trust's motion for order of disgo rgement and final judgment (ECF No. 428 ) is granted; Plaintiff must immediately pay the Hamrick Trust $883,512.00, plus interest at the statutory rate from January 17, 2018 until the full amount is paid; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a notice of supplemental authority (ECF No. 436 ) is denied; Clerk further directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER approving ECF No. 422 Stipulated/Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting ECF No. 419 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Submit A Joint Status Report and File Supplemental Briefs. Joint Status Report and Supplemental Briefs due by 1/15/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER denying without prejudice Patriot Parties' ECF No. 333 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying Patriot Parties' ECF No. 402 Supplemental Motion for Attorney Fees. Patriot Parties' motion addressing the reasonableness of their attorneys' fees and costs due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER - HHM Parties' Motion to Amend (ECF No. 331 ), Motion to Stay (ECF No. 334 ), Rule 50(b) Motion (ECF No. 340 ), and Motion to Stay Pending Appeal (ECF No. 349 ) are denied. It is further ordered Millennium's Motion for Writ of Execution (ECF No. 348 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 JUDGMENT entered as directed by ECF No. 327 Minutes. Signed by Clerk of Court Lance S. Wilson on 11/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER deferring ruling on Third Party Plaintiffs' claim for imposition of a constructive trust until after trial on the merits; denying without prejudice Third Party Defendants' request for summary judgment on the constructive trust claim. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 235 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2016. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Granting 233 Unopposed Motion. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2016. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Granting 202 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. All of Third-Party Plaintiffs claims against Henson are therefore dismissed. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Granting 220 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Replies to 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 202 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Replies due by 6/26/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Granting 218 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 202 and 211 Motions. Responses due by 6/19/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Granting 216 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 202 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Carter Henson, Jr. and 211 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 4/28/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER that 198 Amended Motion to Compel Deposition is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Denying without prejudice 178 Motion to Compel. Denying 182 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Denying 136 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Denying 155 Motion for Leave to File supplemental authorities. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Granting 81 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Third Party Defendants Schain, Leifer Guralnick, Matthew Barnes and Montcalm, LLC are dimissed. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 PROTECTIVE ORDER 157 Stipulation re: Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 121 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 08/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Denying 118 Defendants'/Third-Party Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 08/02/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 82 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 81 Defendants'Amended Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants Amended Motion to Dismiss will be extended to 3 weeks after completion of Barnes deposition. Defendants will have 2 weeks to file their reply brief. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report to inform the Court of the date of Barnes deposition scheduled to occur in August 2013. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Denying 32 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Denying 35 Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 05/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millennium Drilling Co., Inc. v. House-Meyers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly House-Meyers Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Mae Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Kay Hamrick
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Hamrick
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamrick Trust
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly House-Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Drilling Co., Inc.
Represented By: Wade B Gochnour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?