Drover v. LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Kevin Drover |
Defendant: |
LG Electronics USA, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv00510 |
Filed: |
March 27, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cam Ferenbach |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
92
ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice Granting 91 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
December 3, 2014 |
Filing
90
ORDER that the stipulation and order for dismissal must be filed on or before January 12, 2015 re 89 Notice filed by Kevin Drover. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
October 15, 2014 |
Filing
87
ORDER Granting 80 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the entry of this order to file a third amended complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 22, 2014 |
Filing
76
ORDER Granting 71 Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's first cause of action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's second cause of action i s DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have 30 days from the entry of this order to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
June 7, 2013 |
Filing
64
ORDER Denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff if he chooses to amend his complaint, file a motion to amend attaching the proposed Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing
59
ORDER Granting 50 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs unjust enrichment claim be, and the same hereby is, dismissed with prejudice. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
October 18, 2012 |
Filing
49
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiffs claim under the Nevada Deceptive Trade Practices Act. This claim is DISMISSED without prejudice. The motion is DENIED AS MOOT as to plaintiffs claims for breach of express warranty and breach of implied warranty of merchantability because plaintiff voluntarily dismissed these claims. The motion is DENIED as to plaintiffs claim for unjust enrichment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at Plaintiff, if he chooses to amend his complaint, file the Motion to Amend, attaching the proposed Amended Complaint, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Amended Complaint deadline: 11/17/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/18/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?