Kwasniewski et al v. sanofi-aventis U.S., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dylan A. Kwasniewski, Estate of Andrew A. Kwasniewski, Jennifer Kwasniewski and Taylor L. Kwasniewski
Defendant: Behavioral Healthcare Options, Inc., Nadine Leone and sanofi-aventis U.S., LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00515
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER Granting 376 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER. The court will grant the request for a continuance of the joint status report deadline. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 3/25/2019, the parties must file a stipulated dismissal or submit to the court a joint status report outlining what issues are impeding settlement and how or if the court can assist. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 372 the parties' Stipulation to Stay is GRANTED as follows: 1. This case is hereby STAYED pending the parties' mediation on 2/12/2019. 2. The following Motions are DENIED as Moot without prejudic e to the refiling of the Motions if mediation negotiations are unsuccessful: 318 Objection; 335 , 336 Motion to Disqualify; 348 , 349 Motion for Protective Order; 359 , 360 Motion to Lift Stipulated Protective Order; 368 , 369 and Mot ion to Supplement the Objection. 3. The 1/18/2019, hearing on the Motion to Disqualify, Motion for Protective Order, and Motion to Lift Stipulated Protective Order is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, for good cause appearing, 371 the parties' stipulation to seal is GRANTED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objection, (ECF No. 166 ), is OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objection, (ECF No. 175 ), is OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objection, (ECF No. 193 ), is OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 150 ), is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response, (ECF No. 233 ), is GRANTED insomuch as the Court cites to the unsealed portions of it in this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 210 ), is GRANTED pursuant to the foregoing. Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, (ECF No. 209 ), continues on each of its causes of action concerning t he failure to warn allegations. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motions for Partial Summary Judgment, (ECF Nos. 236 , 237 , 238 , 239 ), and Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing for their Motion for Summary Judgment, ( ECF No. 274 ), are DENIED as moot. Specifically, the Court provides Plaintiffs fourteen (14) days from the issuance of this Order to file a single motion for summary judgment consistent with Local Rule 7-3(a). Moreover, Plaintiffs must confine their arguments in the motion for summary judgment to be consistent with the holdings of this Order.Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve Plaintiffs with a copy of 268 the original redacted records and a copy of 269 the newly unredacted records. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must serve the above records on Defendant, or make a timely motion for reconsideration or other appeal of 267 the Court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER Granting 251 Stipulation to Withdraw 226 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/30/17.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER Granting 245 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 226 Motion for Protective Order (Fourth Request). Replies due by 10/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER Granting 227 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 226 Motion for Protective Order (First Request). Responses due by 9/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER that 215 Motion to Stay or in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Dates is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Granting 181 Motion to Compel. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Granting 185 Joint Motion for Status Conference. The Court sets a Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 3/1/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER that 177 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED as moot to the extent it seeks to continue the deposition date. The parties shall agree to a new date among themselves and, if necessary under Rule 29, shall file a stipulation for Court app roval by December 28, 2016. Given that the deposition will not go forward as currently scheduled, the Court hereby EXTENDS the response deadline to the motion to January 19, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Denying 159 Motion to Stay. The parties shall file a joint proposed discovery plan, no later than June 24, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Granting 162 Motion to Remove Attorney V. Andrew Cass from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Denying 151 Motion to Stay. The parties are ORDERED to submit a proposed joint discovery plan no later than June 14, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Denying without prejudice 137 Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Motion for Court Order Permitting Production of Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Denying 121 Plaintiffs' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order granting in part their Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 103 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that 5 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs have until June 24, 2013 to file a Motion to Amend. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Nadine Leone and Behavioral Healthcare Options, Inc. are DISMISSED as parties to this action. FURTHER ORDERED that 67 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 82 Motion to Extend Time to File Response is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AMENDED ORDER Granting 106 Defendants' Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 7 days after the Court rules on the pending 103 Motion to Compel, the parties must file a revised discovery plan and scheduling order with proposed new deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/05/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER that 77 Motion for Reconsideration re 75 Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Denying without Prejudice 96 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying 8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 65 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 61 Stipulated Protective Order of Confidentiality. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that the parties shall file joint Interim Discovery Status Reports on October 29, 2012; December 28, 2012; February 28, 2013; and April 29, 2013; to contain the items enumerated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that the parties shall file joint Interim Discovery Status Reports on November 12, 2012, January 7, 2013, and March 4, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order in compliance with the rules on or before July 6, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 6/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwasniewski et al v. sanofi-aventis U.S., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behavioral Healthcare Options, Inc.
Represented By: Keith A. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Leone
Represented By: Fred W Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sanofi-aventis U.S., LLC
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Harvey L Kaplan
Represented By: Steve L. Morris
Represented By: Jon Andrew Strongman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan A. Kwasniewski
Represented By: Eckley M. Keach
Represented By: Robert. E. Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Andrew A. Kwasniewski
Represented By: Eckley M. Keach
Represented By: Robert. E. Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kwasniewski
Represented By: Eckley M. Keach
Represented By: Robert. E. Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor L. Kwasniewski
Represented By: Eckley M. Keach
Represented By: Robert. E. Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?