Martinez v. Karafeziev et al
Plaintiff: |
Oscar Ulises Martinez |
Defendant: |
Bulex Service Corporation and Kostadin Stoykov Karafeziev |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv00569 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 20, 2017 |
Filing
185
ORDER Granting 184 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
June 20, 2017 |
Filing
183
ORDER Granting 182 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Consol Plaintiff Charles Wotherspoon. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 1, 2016 |
Filing
117
ORDER. The parties requested an extension of the current discovery deadlines with the Court in a motion hearing on February 1, 2016. The Court granted an extension of the discovery cut-off date to March 31, 2016. Accordingly, the following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 3/31/2016. Motions due by 5/2/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 7, 2015 |
Filing
91
ORDER Granting 88 Joint MOTION to Extend Discovery (Fourth Request). Discovery due by 7/7/2015. Motions due by 8/6/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 7, 2014 |
Filing
54
ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Status Report by 2/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 11, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER. The discovery plan and scheduling order submitted by the parties does not comply with LR 26-1(e)(1). The parties shall, within 10 days of this order, either a submit a proposed discovery plan in compliance with LR 26-1(e) or a proposed plan s tating on its face "Special Scheduling Review Requested" and setting forth the reasons why longer or different time periods should apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing
10
ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 5/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?