Johnson v. Wynn Las Vegas LLC

Defendant: Wynn Las Vegas LLC
Plaintiff: Janet Johnson
Case Number: 2:2012cv00726
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 15 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 08/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 1, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time for Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 13, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 61 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines is DENIED as MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that a stipulation for dismissal must be filed on or before March 3, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wynn Las Vegas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Las Vegas LLC
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Tye S. Hanseen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Johnson
Represented By: G. Dallas Horton
Represented By: Christian Smith
Represented By: David L Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.