Capriotti's Sandwich Shop Inc. v. Taylor Family Holdings Inc. et al

Defendant: Natalie Delucia Taylor and Taylor Family Holdings Inc.
Plaintiff: Capriotti's Sandwich Shop Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00793
Filed: May 11, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Amend/Correct cm/ecf service list. Attorney Christopher J Richardson added for Natalie Delucia Taylor and Taylor Family Holdings Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 21, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 64 Ex Parte Request to Amend CM/ECF Service List to Remove Brian Kasparsak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 22, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys for plaintiff Captiotti's Sandwich Shop, Inc. by David Ellis Moore; Jonathan A. Choa; and Richard L. Horwitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 20, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 87 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capriotti's Sandwich Shop Inc. v. Taylor Family Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Delucia Taylor
Represented By: John A. Elzufon
Represented By: Brian Lucian Kasprzak
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Andrea C. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Family Holdings Inc.
Represented By: John A. Elzufon
Represented By: Brian Lucian Kasprzak
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Andrea C. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capriotti's Sandwich Shop Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Represented By: Matthew J. Kreutzer
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Michael L. Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.