United States of America v. Bundy

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cliven Bundy
Unknown: Thomas K. Snodgrass
Case Number: 2:2012cv00804
Filed: May 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Trespass on Public Land
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Michael Kearn's 44 Peremptory Writ of Mandamus. Kearns is an abusive filer, and the clerk of court is directed to return to him, without docketing, any future filings that he attempts in this case. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying 42 Kearns' Notice of Emergency Intervention of Necessity to Protect the Land and People of the United States. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 04/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Michael Kearns - AC)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear for Attorney Stephen R Terrell for United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/13/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear for Attorney Terry M. Petrie for United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/4/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Permit Apperance of Government Attorney Thomas K. Snodgrass. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliven Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nadia Janjua Ahmed
Represented By: Terry M. Petrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Thomas K. Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?