October 30, 2018 |
Filing
246
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of plaintiffs Maha Kosa, Raghid B Kosa, Wisam B Kosa against Meridian Private Residences CH, LLC in the amount of $211,866.32. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 11, 2018 |
Filing
241
ORDER granting 240 Motion to Extend Time to File Motions for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
239
ORDER granting 238 Motion to Extend Time to File Motions by an Additional 30 Days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 28, 2018 |
Filing
234
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON BENCH TRIAL. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 5, 2018 |
Filing
233
ORDER DEEMING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SATISFIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 19, 2018 |
Filing
224
ORDER that 223 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their Sur-Reply on or before April 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
197
ORDER that defendant Rebekah Desmet's motions for summary judgment (ECF No. 252 in 2:12-cv-01104-APG-NJK and ECF No. 205 in 2:12-cv-01108- APG-NJK) are GRANTED. Defendant Rebekah Desmet is entitled to judgment as a matter of law on the plaintif fs' conversion claims against her in each of the following cases:2:12-cv-01104-APG-NJK, 2:12-cv-1106-APG-NJK, 2:12-cv-01108-APG-NJK, and 2:12-cv-01111-APG-NJK. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 3, 2017 |
Filing
192
ORDER that a Status Conference is set for 7/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing
187
ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT. On or before 6/30/2017 the parties shall file a status report regarding what, if anything, remains to be resolved in cases 2:12-cv-1104, 2:12-cv-1106, 2:12-cv-1107, 2:12-cv-1108, and 2:12-cv-1111. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 16, 2016 |
Filing
185
ORDER Certifying Summary Judgment as Final and Appealable. ORDERED that final judgment be entered in favor of defendants Koval Flamingo, LLC, American Invsco Corporation, and Condominium Rental Services, Inc. and against the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 7, 2016 |
Filing
178
ORDER that Ms. Holman and Ms. DeSmet are ordered to appear in Las Vegas Courtroom 6C at 9:15 a.m. on July 20, 2016 to explain why they have not recently participated in this case and whether they intend to do so going forward. The failure to attend this hearing may result in sanctions being entered against both Ms. Holman and Ms. DeSmet, including the possibility of striking pleadings, the entry of default, and monetary sanctions. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 24, 2016 |
Filing
170
ORDER that a Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/26/2016 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
136
ORDER Discharging 124 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing
116
ORDER Granting 115 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 3, 2014 |
Filing
114
ORDER Denying 112 Unopposed Motion for Nicholas Gouletas to Appear at Settlement Conferences by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
April 28, 2014 |
Filing
104
ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for May 6, 2014 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
98
ORDER that 52 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 86 Motion for Oral Hearing on Order Shortening Time on All Motions Pending Longer than 60 Days is DENIED as Improper. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 21, 2014 |
Filing
95
ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Docket No. 113) in Case No. 2:12-cv-1104-APG-NJK, is DENIED. Defendants are sanctioned in the amount of $675.15, payable to Plaintiffs or their counsel, and due forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing
79
ORDER re 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kirk B. Lenhard and Alisa Nave-Worth filed by Condominium Rental Services, Inc., American Invsco Corporation, and Nicholas Gouletas. Response due by 10/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. No later than October 24, 2013, Defendants current counsel of record shall notify Defendants of this order that they appear and shall file a proof of service. With respect to Defendants American Invsco Corporation and Condominium Rental Services Inc., the Court wishes to highlight that corporations may appear in federal court only through licensed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
August 19, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER Denying 71 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Michael Mackenzie Should Not Be Held In Contempt of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall notify Michael Mackenzie of the contents of this order no later than 7:00 p.m. today, August 19, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on this matter set for August 21, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 29, 2013 |
Filing
69
ORDER Denying without prejudice 67 Objection to Deposition Notice filed by Meridian Private Residences CH, LLC Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 17 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 29 is GRANTED. Amended complaint due within 14 days of entry of this order. Defendants shall file an answer on or before 14 days after the filing of the first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
March 27, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER that Responses to 40 Motion to Extend Time Regarding Discovery are due by 3/29/2013. A Motion Hearing is set for 4/4/2013 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|