Neumont University, LLC v. Little Bizzy, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Neumont University, LLC
Defendant: Little Bizzy, LLC and Jesse Nickles
Case Number: 2:2012cv01395
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Neumont has until April 1, 2015, to (1) file proof that Nickles was served by email on or before February 19, 2015, or (2) demonstrate why such service was not effectuated and why Neumonts claims against Nickles should not be dismissed under FRCP 4(m). Should Neumont fail to take one of these steps to the courts satisfaction, its claims against Nickles will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 9, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 66 Motion for Service by Publication is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Neumont has 10 days to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on Jesse Nickles, individually, by email at jesse@littlebizzy.com and file proof of this service. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 20, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Neumont University, LLC and against Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC. in the amount of $1,020,000.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Neumont University, LLC and against Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC in the additional amount of $708.00 in costs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 9, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court will conduct a prove-up hearing on the 45 Motion for Default Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Attorneys Fees and Costson 11/1/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 19, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 15, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying the 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The 38 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED to the extent it is not inconsistent with this Order and Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC's 17 Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter DEFAULT against Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 11, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Little Bizzy shall retain counsel who shall file a notice of appearance in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice no later than January 28, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 7, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC shall have until 12/5/2012 in which to retain counsel who shall file a Notice of Appearance. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC, at the address listed in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neumont University, LLC v. Little Bizzy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Bizzy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Nickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neumont University, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P. Kiefer
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?