Neumont University, LLC v. Little Bizzy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Neumont University, LLC |
Defendant: |
Little Bizzy, LLC and Jesse Nickles |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv01395 |
Filed: |
August 7, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
70
ORDER that Neumont has until April 1, 2015, to (1) file proof that Nickles was served by email on or before February 19, 2015, or (2) demonstrate why such service was not effectuated and why Neumonts claims against Nickles should not be dismissed under FRCP 4(m). Should Neumont fail to take one of these steps to the courts satisfaction, its claims against Nickles will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
February 9, 2015 |
Filing
69
ORDER that 66 Motion for Service by Publication is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Neumont has 10 days to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on Jesse Nickles, individually, by email at jesse@littlebizzy.com and file proof of this service. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
63
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Neumont University, LLC and against Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC. in the amount of $1,020,000.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Neumont University, LLC and against Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC in the additional amount of $708.00 in costs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER that the Court will conduct a prove-up hearing on the 45 Motion for Default Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Attorneys Fees and Costson 11/1/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 19, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER Denying the 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The 38 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED to the extent it is not inconsistent with this Order and Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC's 17 Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter DEFAULT against Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 11, 2013 |
Filing
34
ORDER that Little Bizzy shall retain counsel who shall file a notice of appearance in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice no later than January 28, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
November 7, 2012 |
Filing
25
ORDER that Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC shall have until 12/5/2012 in which to retain counsel who shall file a Notice of Appearance. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant Little Bizzy, LLC, at the address listed in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?