Salebuild, Inc. et al v. Flexisales, Inc.
Plaintiff: SaleBuild, Inc. and Salebuild Ites Pvt. Ltd
Defendant: Flexisales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01403
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 107 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting 105 Stipulation. Discovery due by 9/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting 103 Stipulated Protective Order for the Treatment of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 05/04/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 101 Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 88 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dylan J. Liddiard and approving Designation of Local Counsel Robert J. Cassity. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 02/24/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that 34 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All of Salebuild's claims are dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that this Court will retain jurisdiction over this matter until such time as the courts of the Republic of India formally accept jurisdiction over the matter and the Flexisales entities submit to the jurisdiction of the Indian courts. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salebuild, Inc. et al v. Flexisales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexisales, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SaleBuild, Inc.
Represented By: John S Claassen
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Represented By: Shannon D Nordstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salebuild Ites Pvt. Ltd
Represented By: John S Claassen
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Represented By: Shannon D Nordstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?