Dominguez v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Ivan Dominguez
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E Williams
Case Number: 2:2012cv01609
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING 31 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Denying a Certificate of Appealability. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF with copy mailed to P - DRS)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying 97 & 101 Motions for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 95 Motion to Extend Time Re: 31 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner's Replies to 91 Answer due by 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 92 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 91 Answer to 31 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner's Reply due by 3/8/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Re: 74 Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner's Responses due by 4/6/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 73 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Heather D. Procter terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ERRATA to ORDER. The 66 Order referred to the First Amended Petition as ECF No.12. The First Amended Petition is docketed as ECF No. 31. Respondents are to answer or respond to the 31 First Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 64 Motion to Reopen Case. This action is Reinstated. Respondents have 45 days from the date on which this order is entered to answer or otherwise respond to the 12 first amended petition. Petitioner has 45 days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 45 Motion to Stay and Hold Proceedings in Abeyance. This action is Stayed pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claims. Petitioner shall return to this court with a motion to reopen within 45 days of issuance of the remittitur by the Nevada Supreme Court at the conclusion of the state court proceedings. The clerk of court shall administratively close this action until such time as the court grants a motion to reopen the action. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting in Part Respondents' 34 Motion to Dismiss. Grounds 2, 3, and 14 of the 31 First Amended Petition are Dismissed with prejudice as untimely. The briefing on Petitioner's 45 Motion to Stay and Holding These Proceedings in Abeyance shall proceed in accordance with the Court's 47 Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to 34 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's First-Amended Petition. Responses due by 2/7/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 02/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Unopposed Motion for extension of time. Amended Petition due by 11/14/2013. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that, from this day forward, the hard copy of any exhibits shall be forwardedfor this caseto the staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Amended Petition due by 10/15/2013. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that the FPD is released as counsel. CJA Attorney Mario Valencia is appointed to represent the petitioner herein. Joint Statement due within 45 days. Amended Petition due within 90 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED. The FPD is appointed to represent petitioner. The FPD shall have 30 days to file a notice of appearance or to indicate to the Court its inability to represent petitioner. FURTHER ORDERED that 8 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to the filing of a new or renewed motion to dismiss once an amended petition is on file. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as Moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall FILE and ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the 1 petition on the Respondents. Respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from entr y of this order within which to answer, or otherwise respond to, the petition. If an answer is filed, petitioner shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of service of the answer to file a reply. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that petitioner shall have 30 days from the date that this order is entered to either (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee or (2) submit a completed application to proceedin forma pauperis. The Clerk shall SEND to petitioner the approved form for an application to proceed in forma pauperis and 2 copies of this order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ivan Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?