Brenes et al vs Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Brenes and Lydia Vasquez-Brenes
Defendant: Jeffrey Chamberlin, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Sean Miller and Theodore Snodgrass
Case Number: 2:2012cv01635
Filed: September 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 84 plaintiffs' motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(a) be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court's 2/16/ 17, 84 order be, and the same hereby is, AMENDED, to include the following sentence: This court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state claims in this action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiffs shall submit their rule 60(a) motion to this court within seven (7) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall indicate whether their motion is unopposed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. The court ISSUES an indicative ruling pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1(a)(3) that 90 plaintiff's unopposed motion raises a substantial issue. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Sean Miller Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that 72 Motion for order certifying defendants' interlocutory appeal as frivolous is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 66 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Denying 68 Ricardo Brenes' Motion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 70 the Department's Motion for Leave is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Brenes' opposition to 66 Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department� 39;s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is due Monday, November 10, 2014, and that Las Metropolitan Police Department's reply is due Thursday, November 20, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 50 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying as moot 28 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying in Part and Denying as Unripe in Part 27 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Defendants' 35 Motion to Extend Time is Granted. The discovery cutoff date is extended until 1/15/2014. Plaintiffs have until 11/18/2013 to seek leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brenes et al vs Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Brenes
Represented By: Peter Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Vasquez-Brenes
Represented By: Peter Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?