Toromanova v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Dimitritza Toromanova |
Defendant: |
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, Tiffany K Labo and National Default Servicing Corporation |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv01637 |
Filed: |
September 18, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
73
ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing
71
ORDER Granting 70 Motion to expunge lis pendens and for an order to show cause. Show Cause Response due within 20 days. Submission of Proposed Order due within 10 days. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
March 26, 2014 |
Filing
68
ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER Denying 52 Plaintiff's Objection to the Court's orders. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
June 7, 2013 |
Filing
51
ORDER Denying 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/07/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing
38
ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
January 7, 2013 |
Filing
35
ORDER Granting 8 , 10 , and 14 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Defendants Motion to expunge Lis Pendens is GRANTED. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. sh all have 10 days to prepare an appropriate order expunging lis pendens. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Defendants Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant is GRANTED. Plaintiff Dimitritza Toromanova is declared a VEXATIOUS LITIGANT and is PE RMANENTLY ENJOINED from filing any further actions against defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. relating to the subject property or recording any documents against the subject property without first obtaining leave of Court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 01/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
November 30, 2012 |
Filing
31
ORDER Granting 25 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Extend Time to File Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion Hearing set for December 3, 2012 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before the undersigned is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for 2/28/13 at 9:00 am in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?