SHFL Entertainment, Inc. v. Digideal Corporation

Defendant: Digideal Corporation
Plaintiff: SHFL Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01782
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2016 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting and Adopting 165 Report and Recommendation, DENYING 147 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Digideal Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 21, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 149 Motion to Shorten Time re 148 Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal. Responses due by 4/25/2016. Replies due by 4/26/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 30, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 124 Motion to Vacate Injunctive Relief is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 135 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Defendant's 123 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 10, 2016 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 122 Motion for Rule 16 Pretrial Conference without prejudice with leave to renew after the entry of order deciding 123 and 124 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 02/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 11, 2016 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to Plaintiff SHFL Entertainment, Inc.'s 122 Motion for Rule 16 Pretrial Conference must be filed or before 01/19/2016. No reply necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 17, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 81 Motion to Stay. Denying as moot 86 Motion for Leave to File. Denying with leave to renew after the stay is lifted 96 and 97 Motions to Compel. Granting 98 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 27, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 78 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. At this time, the parties do not propose changes to the 39 Scheduling Order of 3/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 20, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 30 Motion for Hearing is DENIED as MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that 63 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 24, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 52 Joint Motion for Consideration of Issues Raised in Stipulated Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the attached Amended Protective Order applies. The parties must comply with the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 44 7 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal or used at trial. The parties 40 Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order, as modified to include this requirement and signed by the court, is APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 05/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 9, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside; Denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as Moot; and Denying 46 Defendant's Motion for Hearing as Moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 05/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 15, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties must comply with the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal or used at trial. The parties Stipulation and 40 Proposed Protective Order, as modified to include this requirement and signed by the court, is APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 16, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant DigiDeal Corporation's Counsel of Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHFL Entertainment, Inc. v. Digideal Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digideal Corporation
Represented By: Richard H Newman
Represented By: Robert L Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHFL Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Eric T Aldrian
Represented By: Kimball Anderson
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Howard I Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?