October 18, 2018 |
Filing
186
ORDER accepting and adopting 185 Report and Recommendation; this case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
175
ORDER granting 174 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. The call in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
October 4, 2016 |
Filing
173
ORDER Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2016 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
September 19, 2016 |
Filing
168
ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting and Adopting 165 Report and Recommendation, DENYING 147 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Digideal Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 21, 2016 |
Filing
150
ORDER Granting 149 Motion to Shorten Time re 148 Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal. Responses due by 4/25/2016. Replies due by 4/26/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
March 30, 2016 |
Filing
143
ORDER that Defendant's 124 Motion to Vacate Injunctive Relief is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 135 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Defendant's 123 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 10, 2016 |
Filing
136
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 122 Motion for Rule 16 Pretrial Conference without prejudice with leave to renew after the entry of order deciding 123 and 124 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 02/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
January 11, 2016 |
Filing
126
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to Plaintiff SHFL Entertainment, Inc.'s 122 Motion for Rule 16 Pretrial Conference must be filed or before 01/19/2016. No reply necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
April 17, 2014 |
Filing
102
ORDER Denying as moot 81 Motion to Stay. Denying as moot 86 Motion for Leave to File. Denying with leave to renew after the stay is lifted 96 and 97 Motions to Compel. Granting 98 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
November 27, 2013 |
Filing
79
ORDER Granting 78 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. At this time, the parties do not propose changes to the 39 Scheduling Order of 3/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing
66
ORDER that 10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 30 Motion for Hearing is DENIED as MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that 63 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 24, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDER Granting 52 Joint Motion for Consideration of Issues Raised in Stipulated Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the attached Amended Protective Order applies. The parties must comply with the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 44 7 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal or used at trial. The parties 40 Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order, as modified to include this requirement and signed by the court, is APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 05/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER Granting 36 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside; Denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as Moot; and Denying 46 Defendant's Motion for Hearing as Moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 05/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
41
PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties must comply with the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal or used at trial. The parties Stipulation and 40 Proposed Protective Order, as modified to include this requirement and signed by the court, is APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 16, 2013 |
Filing
27
ORDER Granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant DigiDeal Corporation's Counsel of Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|