Kabo Tool Company et al v. Porauto Industrial Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: |
Chih-Ching Hsien and Kabo Tool Company |
Defendant: |
Accuaire Corp., Chih-Hsiang Hsu and Porauto Industrial Co., Ltd. |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv01859 |
Filed: |
October 30, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Lloyd D. George |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
118
ORDER that 78 Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing
117
ORDER Granting 116 Stipulation to Stay this matter for 30 days after the Federal Circuit issues an appellate order ruling on Kabo's appeal in the JSP Action. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 10, 2014 |
Filing
108
ORDER SETTING HEARING re 102 Order. Hearing set for 7/11/2014 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
100
ORDER re 97 Renewed Emeregency Motion for Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2014 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 7, 2014 |
Filing
93
ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 20, 2014 |
Filing
87
ORDER Denying 79 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
83
ORDER that the parties submit an amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 3/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
75
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 40 Motion for Leave to File to File Surreply to Defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' 42 Motion to Seal 41 Declaration is Granted. Defendants' 54 Motion to Reconsider or Amend [53 ] Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is Denied. Defendants' 59 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default is Granted. The Clerk of Court shall strike 58 Entry of Default. Defendants' 60 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal is Denied. Defendant's 72 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 67 Order is Denied. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
67
ORDER Denying 61 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
April 15, 2013 |
Filing
39
ORDER Denying 32 Motion for Protective Order and 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?