January 11, 2018 |
Filing
201
ORDER Granting Defendant's 197 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 10, 2017 |
Filing
193
ORDER Denying Plaintiff Anthony Bailey's 188 Motion for an Order Scheduling Trial. Defendants shall file a supplemental motion for summary judgment providing new evidence regarding exhaustion within 21 days of this order (see Order for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 25, 2016 |
Filing
182
ORDER Granting 180 Motion to Extend Copy Work Limit. The Nevada Department of Corrections must extend Plaintiff's prison copy work limit by $100.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing
171
ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 165 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal filed by Anthony Bailey. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 27, 2015 |
Filing
159
ORDER Denying 157 Motion to Recall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing
151
ORDER that all claims asserted by interested party Tony G. Hewitt are Dismissed. The clerk's office is instructed to close the case and enter judgment in favor of defendants. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 5, 2015 |
Filing
141
ORDER that Magistrate Judge Hoffman's 103 Report and Recommendation is Adopted in full. All claims brought by Plaintiffs Norman Belcher and Gabriel Yates shall be Dismissed. Defendants Flippo, Kelso, Suey, and Aspiazu's 125 Mot ion for Summary Judgment and 105 , 108 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment are Granted. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing
122
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 120 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
August 11, 2014 |
Filing
111
ORDER Denying Defendants' 80 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff Anthony Bailey's In Forma Pauperis Status and Declare him a Vexatious Litigant. Plaintiff's 107 Motion for Statements is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing
99
ORDER Denying 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order and Denying 97 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint an E.P.A. Monitor. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
86
ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Copies and Denying Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
79
ORDER Denying without prejudice 32 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff Bailey In Forma Pauperis Status and Declare a Vexatious Litigant. Motions due by 2/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
January 8, 2014 |
Filing
66
ORDER Granting 33 Defendants' Motion to Enforce Payment Fees on Plaintiffs John Scott, Norman Belcher and Gabriel Yates. Show Cause Brief due by 1/21/2014. Responses, if any, due by 1/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 01/08/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
December 17, 2013 |
Filing
65
ORDER that 56 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 4, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER Denying without prejudice 59 Motion for Joinder. Denying as moot 60 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDER Denying 50 Motion for Joinder by non-Party Jerome A. Sears. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 31, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDER Denying 47 Motion for Joinder by Lee Reed. Denying 48 Motion for Joinder by Larry McGee. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing
46
ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Strike 39 Emergency Notice. Non-Party Andre J. King Hardimans improper filing 42 shall be stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 18, 2013 |
Filing
45
ORDER Denying 43 Motion for Joinder by Non-Party Harold Marin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 18, 2013 |
Filing
40
ORDER Denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 06/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 14, 2013 |
Filing
36
ORDER Denying 18 Motion to Restore Defendants Clark County, Clark County Detention Center, LVMPD. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing
24
ORDER Denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
December 17, 2012 |
Filing
16
ORDER Denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion of Possible Imminent Danger/Retaliation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 7, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER that Defendants Lt. Kelly, Clark County Detention Center and Clark County, Nevada are Dismissed. Denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel.This Action shall proceed in accordance with the court's 3 Minute Order and 9 Answer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/7/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|