United States of America v. Lee

Respondent: Theodore Lee
Petitioner: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv01994
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 63 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 20, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's 42 Motion to Dismiss is Granted and the case is Dismissed. The 45 Motion to Stay and the 55 Motion to Strike are Denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 30, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Strike. A separate decision and order will be entered shortly addressing the merits of the motions under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH)
May 22, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION granting 13 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing continued to 8/13/2013 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Theodore Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Jeremy N Hendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?