Orr v. Nevada State Board of Osteopathic Medicine et al
Plaintiff: Marian Orr
Defendant: Paul Edwards, Ronald Hedger, Paul Kalekas, C. Dean MIlne and Nevada State Board of Osteopathic Medicine
Case Number: 2:2012cv02119
Filed: December 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Nevada State Board of Osteopathic Medicine against Marian Orr. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying without prejudice 40 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying 21 Motion for Clarification and/or Reconsider. Granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Attorney Michael K. Naethe from Electronic Service List and Court Docket. Attorney Michael K. Naethe terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that a Pretrial Conference is set for 12/9/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting in part and Denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims against all defendants except the Nevada State Board of Osteopathic Medicine are dismissed. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. Nevada State Board of Osteopathic Medicine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Edwards
Represented By: Louis A. Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Hedger
Represented By: Louis A. Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kalekas
Represented By: Louis A. Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Dean MIlne
Represented By: Louis A. Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada State Board of Osteopathic Medicine
Represented By: Louis A. Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Orr
Represented By: Jacob L Hafter
Represented By: Michael K. Naethe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?