Epperson v. Henderson Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: |
Clifford Epperson |
Defendant: |
Medical Department, Henderson Detention Center and Dr. Saaveda |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv02173 |
Filed: |
December 20, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 14, 2013 |
Filing
51
ORDER that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice as moot and that this action shall be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This dismissal shall count as a "strike" for purposes of 28. U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk shall enter final judgment accordingly, dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/14/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 1, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER re 39 Notice of Appeal. ORDER certifying to the Court of Appeals that the appeal is not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc COA - MMM)
|
March 18, 2013 |
Filing
34
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall file the complaint and that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim, subject to leave to amend within thirty (30) days of entry of this order to correct the deficiencies in the co mplaint, if possible. FURTHER ORDERED that all motions (dkt. nos. 9, 17-19 & 22-27) are DENIED, for the reasons assigned herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the fugitive filings 12 , 21 , 28 , 29 , 31 & 33 shall be STRICKEN. The Clerk shall send pla intiff a copy of the original complaint that he submitted together with two copies of a § 1983 complaint form and one copy of the instructions for the form. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/18/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 30, 2013 |
Filing
10
ORDER Denying without prejudice 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from entry of this order to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or submit a properly completed pauper application with all required, and new, financial attachments. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order, and of the five-page pauper application (dkt. no. 1), by mail to Corrections Superintendent Lauer. FURTHER ORDERED that all exhibits filed at the time of e ntry of this order, including Docket Nos. 3, 5, 6 and 8, shall be STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall file no more exhibits in this action other than exhibits that are filed either in support of a motion or in response to a Court order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; ifp form w/instructions to plaintiff - MMM)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing
4
ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall seal 3 Exhibit A. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court, to protect Plaintiffs personal identifiers, shall refile Exhibit A with Plaintiffs personal identifiers redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?