Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Western Explosives Systems Company et al

Defendant: Jared L. Fredrick, Paul A. Fredrick, Thomas C. Fredrick, Jr. and Western Explosives Systems Company
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust and Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Case Number: 2:2013cv00092
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 75 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 01/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 26, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice Granting 73 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 23, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 53 Motion for Setting of Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/22/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
December 29, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 46 Stipulation to continue settlement conference. Settlement Conference is CONTINUED to 3/18/2015 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 3, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 27 Motion to Compel. Denying as moot 35 Stipulation to Extend Time to File a Response to 27 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 2, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Motion Hearing is set for 9/29/2014 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe re: 32 Motion to Withdraw. Responses due by 9/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) Modified hearing judge on 9/2/2014. NEF Regenerated. (ASB)
August 12, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 25 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Western Explosives Systems Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared L. Fredrick
Represented By: Chantel D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Fredrick
Represented By: Chantel D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Fredrick, Jr.
Represented By: Chantel D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Explosives Systems Company
Represented By: Chantel D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Jacqueline L Sugarman
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Jacqueline L Sugarman
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Jacqueline L Sugarman
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Jacqueline L Sugarman
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?