Beckwith et al v. City Of Henderson et al

Plaintiff: Dori Beckwith and Scott Beckwith
Defendant: Jutta Chambers, City Of Henderson, Robert Pool and Robert Pool, PC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00125
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintif Dori Beckwith against Defendant Robert Pool et.,al. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 4, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Declining to Enter 65 Proposed Default Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Dori Beckwith shall prepare an appropriate judgment in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 6, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 57 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Beckwith shall prepare an appropriate judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 63 Motion for Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) certification is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 1, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 45 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to plaintiff's federal claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 46 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 50 Motion to Set Aside is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff file a motion for default judgment against defendant Pool within ten days of the date of this order, when the court intends to close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 14, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 Order on Stipulation for Protective Order. Parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 15, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 27 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling. Discovery due by 3/31/2014. Motions due by 4/30/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/30/2014. The Court instructs the parties that in the future they must comply with the deadlines set out in the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckwith et al v. City Of Henderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dori Beckwith
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Beckwith
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jutta Chambers
Represented By: Josh M. Reid
Represented By: Nancy D Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Henderson
Represented By: Josh M. Reid
Represented By: Nancy D Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Pool
Represented By: Cory J. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Pool, PC
Represented By: Cory J. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?