Ballard et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Daniel D. Ballard, Fredrica C. Ballard and William H. Ballard
Defendant: Department of Family Services and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 2:2013cv00130
Filed: January 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiffs to contact LVMPDs attorney to arrange for a Rule 26(f) conference no later than July 28, 2015. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiffs and LVMPD to hold the Rule 26(f) conference no later than August 3, 2015, and to file a proposed discovery plan no later than August 10, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 22, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties to hold the Rule 26(f) conference no later than July 6, 2015, and to file a joint proposed discovery plan no later than July 20, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 2, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendants Clark County District Court, Los Angeles Times, Missouri Dept of Family Services, New York Bugle, The Sun, Clark County Detention Center and Clark County District Attorney. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 18, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 63 Report and Recommendation is REJECTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 42 , 44 and 48 Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED. Department of Family Services, Las Vegas Review Journal, Nevada Parole and Probation, Channel 13 KTNV ABC and Channel 8 News Now terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 6, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 5, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing re 56 Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/13/2014 04:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 3, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs are to file a notice with the Court, no later than 10/17/2014, indicating the address at which they will be receiving case-related material. In light of the confusion as to Plaintiffs' mailing address, the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to mail notice of this order to both the address provided at Docket 31 and theaddress provided at Docket No. 28 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - mailed as ordered - EDS)
August 29, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Quash Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 21, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Receipt of Payment. Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 within 120 days. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 14, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 21 Report and Recommendation is accepted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 18 , 19 , 20 Plaintiffs' renewed Applications to Proceed in Forma Pauperis are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims will be dismissed without prejudice unless they pay the filing fee of $350.00 within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 13 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Any renewed motion for appointment of guardian ad litem must be filed only after retaining counsel and no later than August 10, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 3, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that if Plaintiffs Nathan J. Ballard and Psalm M. Ballard intend to remain Plaintiffs each must file a completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiffs shall have until 7/3/2013 to file Applications to Proceed in Forma Pauperis an d to have motions filed seeking representation through a guardian ad litem. The Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiffs two blank Applications to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiffs may pay the $400 filing fee no later than 7/3/2013. Failure to c omply with this Order will result in a recommendation to the District Judge that Plaintiffs Nathan J. Ballard and Psalm M. Ballard be dismissed as Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - forms mailed to Plaintiffs at PO Box address - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel D. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrica C. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?