Karimova v. Alessi & Koenig, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Zulfiya S. Karimova
Defendant: Resources Group, LLC, Eddie Haddad, Iyad Haddad, Michael F. Bohn, Alessi & Koenig, LLC and Bernini Drive Trust
Case Number: 2:2013cv00151
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Accepting 24 Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Plaintiff shall initiate a Rule 26(f) conference within seven (7) days of this order and the parties shall submit a proposed stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order by January 30, 2014. Failure to comply with the requirements of this order may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Defendant Alessi and Koenig, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karimova v. Alessi & Koenig, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resources Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Haddad
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iyad Haddad
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Bohn
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernini Drive Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zulfiya S. Karimova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?