Cretney-Tsosie, et al. v. Creekside Hospice II, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Joanne Cretney-Tsosie, Veneta Lepera, State of Nevada and United States of America
Defendant: Creekside Home Care II, LLC, Creekside Hospice II, LLC, Skilled Healthcare Group, Inc. and Skilled Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00167
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Joanne Cretney-Tsosie against Creekside Hospice II, LLC, Skilled Healthcare Group, Inc. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 202 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 199 Motion to Stay the Petition for Attorney's Fees and Costs and Staying this case in its entirety pending Ninth Circuit's resolution. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER re Settlement Agreement dismissing claims (see order for details). Consistent with the terms of the Settlement Agreement, the exclusive jurisdiction and venue for any other dispute relating to the Settlement Agreement is the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 193 Joint Motion to Continue Stay until 6/28/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 184 Motion to Stay this case in its entirety until 4/28/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER re 172 Status Report. Case Stayed until 1/6/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting 164 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jenelle Beavers withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 09/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Denying without prejudice as moot 98 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 123 Motion for Leave to File; Denying 144 Motion to Stay. Case shall remain Stayed until 11/15/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Granting Defendants' 95 Motion to Enforce. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any request for relief not specifically addressed in this Order is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting 149 Joint Motion to Reseal Documents. IT IS ORDERED that 102 and 136 shall be sealed and Plaintiff shall file redacted versions of 1 and 4 to prevent dissemination of personally identifying information. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further stipulations or joint requests will be approved that fail to comply with LR 6-2(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Unseal. The clerk of court shall unseal sealed documents in both consolidated actions (Case no 2:13-cv-01283 and 2:13-cv-0167). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER on 106 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED to the limited extent that the court will issue a temporary protective order precluding the depositions of Defendants current and former employees who have been scheduled before the hearing. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. 109 Motion to Withdraw, Strike or Seal Portion of Exhibit B is GRANTED. As 109 replaces 108 with the exception of Exhibit B, 108 is stricken and Exhibit B is sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying as Moot 65 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 83 Motion to Extend Time to Amend Pleadings. Amended Complaint deadline: 7/27/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying 74 Motion to Stay Discovery and for Alternative Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 9/30/2015. Motions due by 7/15/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2015. Status Report due by 6/26/2015. Status Conference set for 6/30/2015 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation to Extend Motion Hearing re 72 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and 74 Motion to Stay Discovery. Motion Hearing reset for 4/28/2015 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cretney-Tsosie, et al. v. Creekside Hospice II, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creekside Home Care II, LLC
Represented By: Charles Harold McCrea
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creekside Hospice II, LLC
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Charles Harold McCrea
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Howard J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skilled Healthcare Group, Inc.
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Howard J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skilled Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: John A Cosgriff
Represented By: Charles Harold McCrea
Represented By: Kathleen McDermott
Represented By: Howard J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Cretney-Tsosie
Represented By: Juliet Berger-White
Represented By: Steven H. Cohen
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Caryn C. Lederer
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: L. Timothy Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veneta Lepera
Represented By: Ruth L. Cohen
Represented By: Paul S. Padda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Mark N. Kemberling
Represented By: Donna R. Rohwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kavitha J Babu
Represented By: Jenelle Beavers
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?