Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Jones et al

Defendant: Stephen Dervenis, Kelly Jones and Thomas Procopio
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2013cv00168
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2015 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 246 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Based on the parties' stipulation 246 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 5, 2015 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 209 Motion to Keep Opposition and Errata Under Seal. Plaintiff's 199 Opposition to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Matieral Facts and 208 Supporting Errata shall remain sealed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defen dants' 210 Motion to File Under Seal is Granted. Exhibits 178, 197, 198, and 214 to Defendants' Supplemental Appendix in Support of Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in further support of Defendants' 214 M otion for Summary Judgment shall be filed under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' 212 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in further support of Defendants' Motion shall be filed under seal. Defendant is ordered to s ubmit a redacted copy on the public record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' 213 Opposition to FDIC-R's Statement of Facts and Reply Statement shall be filed under seal. Defendant is ordered to submit a redacted copy on the publ ic record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 218 Motion to Seal Unredacted Opposition is Granted. Plaintiff's 218 Opposition to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 29, 2015 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 95 Motion to Amend Complaint. It is Further Ordered that all Deadlines in this Case are Stayed for 30 Days. Status Conference set for 10/26/2015 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 18, 2015 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 229 Objection to Defendants' 228 Reply. Defendants' 228 is hereby stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 14, 2015 192 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 185 , 188 Motion to Reconsider Order is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 190 Motion to Keep Declaration of Patrick J. Richard Under Seal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all exhibits to Defendan ts' Motion for Summary Judgment 163 not specifically identified in this Order as remaining under seal must be filed on the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 18, 2015 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 184 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responses to 165 and 170 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/20/2015. Replies due by 8/10/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 27, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 160 Stipulation of Dismissal. Defendant Thomas Procopio Terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 6, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 157 Stipulation to Extend Time. Motions due by 6/4/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 30, 2015 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Motion to file Motion to strike under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
February 27, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 133 Stipulation and Addendum to the Stipulated Protective Order entered March 11, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 19, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss. Any breach of fiduciary duty claim founded upon a duty of loyalty is dismissed. It is denied in all other respects. And Denying 32 Motion to join a Necessary Party. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
March 11, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 58 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 03/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 26, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 30 Motion for More Definite Statement is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Dervenis
Represented By: Carleton R. Burch
Represented By: Kerry L. Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Jones
Represented By: Carleton R. Burch
Represented By: Kerry L. Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Procopio
Represented By: Carleton R. Burch
Represented By: Kerry L. Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: James B. Davidson
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Frank V. Langfitt
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?